Thompson, Darcee v. Progressive Universal Insurance Co.

Plaintiff: Darcee Thompson
Defendant: Progressive Universal Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Sammantha Jeannine Tillotson for Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (Tillotson, Sammantha)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin Tyler Winquist for Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (Winquist, Justin)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Progressive Universal Insurance Co. answer due 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/1/2019. (kwf)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Casie Dell Collignon for Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (Collignon, Casie)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Marisa Berlinger for Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (Berlinger, Marisa)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (Everts, Gregory)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Everts, Gregory)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory T. Everts for Defendant Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (Everts, Gregory)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Progressive Universal Insurance Co. (kwf)
March 6, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Progressive Universal Insurance Co., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2420038.), filed by Darcee Thompson, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Vehicle Valuation Report, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Kotchen, Daniel)
March 5, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file Summons and Complaint. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson, Darcee v. Progressive Universal Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Universal Insurance Co.
Represented By: Justin Tyler Winquist
Represented By: Casie Dell Collignon
Represented By: Sammantha Jeannine Tillotson
Represented By: Gregory T. Everts
Represented By: Marisa Berlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcee Thompson
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Kotchen
Represented By: Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?