Cooper, Demetrius v. Roach, Brittany et al
Plaintiff: Demetrius Cooper
Defendant: Gary Boughton, Brittany Roach, Alexandria Leibert, Heather Schwenn, Michael Kemerling, Sandra McArdle and Jolinda Waterman
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00159
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (nln),(ps)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/12/2019. (rks),(ps)
March 12, 2019 Motion for PLRA Screening. (rks),(ps)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Demetrius Cooper regarding filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt addressed to Attorney General, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
March 11, 2019 Filing fee received : $ 400.00, receipt number 34690034061. (rks),(ps)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds to pay for printing copies from Ed-Net account by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper.(rks),(ps)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Mandate Better Access to Courts by Plaintiff Demetrius Cooper. (rks),(ps)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 02/27/2019. (rks),(ps)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Demetrius Cooper. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Disbursement Request, #4 Envelope) (rks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper, Demetrius v. Roach, Brittany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Roach
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria Leibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Schwenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kemerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?