Tischer, Jessica v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Jessica Tischer
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00166
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 5/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due 1/17/2020. Settlement Letters due 5/8/2020. Motions in Limine due 5/15/2020. Response to Motion due 5/29/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/24/19. (jat)
April 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/19/2019 [:10] (cak)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Report by Plaintiff Jessica Tischer. (Leneave, Cortney) Modified on 4/17/2019. (lak)
March 21, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hayden, Thomas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hayden, Thomas) Modified on 3/21/2019. (lak)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Brody Elizabeth Dawson for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Dawson, Brody)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas A.P. Hayden for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Hayden, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (jat)
March 4, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
March 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Company, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2418632.), filed by Jessica Tischer, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Leneave, Cortney) (Main Document replaced and additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #3 Order Appointing Personal Representative) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tischer, Jessica v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Thomas A.P. Hayden
Represented By: Brody Elizabeth Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Tischer
Represented By: Cortney S. Leneave
Represented By: Paul Anthony Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?