Turner, Anthony v. Hepp, Randall et al
Plaintiff: Anthony H. Turner
Defendant: Jon E. Litscher, Candace Whitman, Randall R. Hepp, Pat Chamberlain and Mark Schomisch
Case Number: 3:2019cv00431
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon Flugaur for Defendants Pat Chamberlain, Randall R. Hepp, Jon E. Litscher, Mark Schomisch, Candace Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Flugaur, Brandon),(ps)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Laure C. Rakvic-Farr for Defendants Pat Chamberlain, Randall R. Hepp, Jon E. Litscher, Mark Schomisch, Candace Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Pat Chamberlain, Randall R. Hepp, Jon E. Litscher, Mark Schomisch, Candace Whitman. (Rakvic-Farr, Laure),(ps)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Candace Whitman, Jon E. Litscher, Pat Chamberlain, Randall R. Hepp, Mark Schomisch. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Following service and defendants' answer, this case is STAYED pending resolution of Stapleton v. Hepp, 16-cv-406-jdp (W.D. Wis.). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/8/2019. (jef),(ps)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps)
June 27, 2019 Partial Filing fee received : $6.66, receipt number 34690034806. (rks),(ps)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 6.66 assessed. (Initial partial filing fee due 7/1/2019.) Plaintiff's motion for use of his release account to pay all of the fees and costsin this case, Dkt. #5 , is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/10/2019. (jef),(ps)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Anthony H. Turner. (nln),(ps)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Anthony H. Turner. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony H. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff to submit $400 or Motion for IFP due by 6/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/29/2019. (rks),(ps)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anthony H. Turner. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Interview/Information Requests, Memo, and documents related to DOC Complaint number FLCI-2019-1730, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner, Anthony v. Hepp, Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon E. Litscher
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Whitman
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall R. Hepp
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Chamberlain
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schomisch
Represented By: Brandon Flugaur
Represented By: Laure C. Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?