North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Scott Redman, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, Jerry Shea, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund and North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund
Defendant: Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00460
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Scott Redman, Jerry Shea (Thompson, Philip)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC. (kwf)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Service by Plaintiffs Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Scott Redman, Jerry Shea as to #7 Affidavit, #4 Motion for Entry of Default, #5 Affidavit, #6 Motion for Default Judgment. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Scott Redman, Jerry Shea re: #6 Motion for Default Judgment. (Thompson, Philip)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Philip E. Thompson filed by Plaintiffs Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, Scott Redman, Jerry Shea re: #4 Motion for Entry of Default. (Thompson, Philip)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 6/24/2019. (lak)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC. (kwf)
June 6, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
June 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2479174.), filed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, Jerry Shea, Scott Redman, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 6/5/2019: Corrected parties. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Redman
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Shea
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?