Weber, Austin v. Fred Meyer, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Austin Weber
Defendant: Fred Meyer, Inc., KeHE Distributors, Inc., Fred Meyer, Inc. d/b/a Fred Meyer, World Finer Foods, Inc., KeHE Enterprises, LLC, The Kroger Company, KeHE Distributors, LLC and World Finer Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00493
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 Disregard. Modified on 7/23/2019. (lak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Maria D. Sanders for Defendants Fred Meyer, Inc., The Kroger Company. (Sanders, Maria)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant World Finer Foods, LLC. World Finer Foods, LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant World Finer Foods, Inc. World Finer Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant KeHE Enterprises, LLC. KeHE Enterprises, LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant KeHE Distributors, LLC. KeHE Distributors, LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant KeHE Distributors, Inc.. KeHE Distributors, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant The Kroger Company. The Kroger Company waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendants Fred Meyer, Inc. Fred Meyer, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Stearns, Denis) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is satisfied that plaintiff Austin Weber's amended complaint, Dkt. #5 , contains allegations sufficient to establish subject matter jurisdiction in compliance with the court's June 17, 2019 order. Dkt. #3 . Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/1/2019. (jls)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Austin Weber. (Stearns, Denis) Modified on 6/27/2019. (lak)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Disregard. Wrong event used. Modified on 6/21/2019 (jls).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 7/1/2019. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/17/2019. (jls)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fred Meyer, Inc., KeHE Distributors, Inc., KeHE Enterprises, LLC, The Kroger Company, World Finer Foods, Inc., and World Finer Foods, LLC. (jls)
June 14, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
June 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2484749.), filed by Austin Weber, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - KeHE Distributors, Inc., #3 Summons - KeHE Enterprises, LLC, #4 Summons - The Kroger Company, #5 Summons - World Finer Foods, Inc., #6 Summons - World Finer Foods, LLC, #7 Summons - Fred Meyer, Inc, #8 Summons - The Kroger Company (duplicate)) (Stearns, Denis) Modified on 6/14/2019. (lak/jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber, Austin v. Fred Meyer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer, Inc.
Represented By: Maria D. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeHE Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer, Inc. d/b/a Fred Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Finer Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeHE Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Represented By: Maria D. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeHE Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Finer Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Weber
Represented By: Denis W. Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?