Brost, Michael v. Capstan Corporation

Plaintiff: Michael J. Brost
Defendant: Capstan Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00535
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 is GRANTED without the need for a response. Capstan Corporation answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/6/19. (jat)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Capstan Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint (Duplicate of #1 .), #2 Notice of Filing) (Casieri, Vincent) Modified on 8/6/2019: Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
August 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Capstan Corporation answer due 8/13/2019. (See Certificate of Service #4 ) (jat)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Michael J. Brost. (Balmer, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Michael J. Brost. (Balmer, James) Modified on 8/5/2019. (lak)
July 30, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Vincent Casieri for Defendant Capstan Corporation. (Casieri, Vincent) Modified on 7/29/2019: Jury Demand changed to Defendant. (lak)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capstan Corporation. (jat)
June 28, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
June 28, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capstan Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2493258.), filed by Michael J. Brost. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Balmer, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brost, Michael v. Capstan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Brost
Represented By: James Walter Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstan Corporation
Represented By: Vincent Casieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?