Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund et al v. Best Brickwashing, LLC
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin, Gary Burns, Wisconsin Masons Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund and Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund
Defendant: Best Brickwashing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00561
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Modified on 7/15/2019. (lak)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Best Brickwashing, LLC. (voc)
July 12, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
July 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice by Plaintiffs Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin, Gary Burns, Wisconsin Masons Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund, Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund re: #1 Complaint. Civil Cover Sheet. (Thompson, Philip)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Best Brickwashing, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2498963.), filed by Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund, Gary Burns, Wisconsin Masons Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund, Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 7/10/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund et al v. Best Brickwashing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Brickwashing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers District Council of Wisconsin
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Burns
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Pension Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Masons Health Care Fund
Represented By: Philip Eric Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?