Merrick, Kyle v. Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC
Plaintiff: Kyle Merrick
Defendant: Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00565
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC re: #7 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Kyle Merrick. (Little, Brendan)
August 23, 2019 Notice to Counsel: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 is canceled. (jat)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Nathan DeLadurantey filed by Plaintiff Kyle Merrick re: #7 Motion for Attorney Fees, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fees, #2 Exhibit B - Fee Declarations (Not filed as separate entries.), #3 Exhibit C - Service Invoice) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 8/23/2019. (lak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Kyle Merrick. Brief in Opposition due 9/12/2019. Brief in Reply due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Disregard. See #8 ., #2 Disregard. See #8 ., #3 Disregard. See #8 ., #4 Disregard. See #8 .) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment by Plaintiff Kyle Merrick, (Attachments: #1 Offer of Judgment) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
July 31, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC. (Little, Brendan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER by Defendant Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC. (Little, Brendan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC. (jat)
July 11, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
July 11, 2019 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Kyle Merrick. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2499738.), filed by Kyle Merrick, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrick, Kyle v. Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Merrick
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Recovery Bureau LLC
Represented By: Brendan H Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?