Flambeau, Inc. v. The Michaels Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Flambeau, Inc.
Defendant: The Michaels Companies, Inc. and Darice, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00573
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court accepts and enters the parties' third stipulation to extend defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond. It does not intend to accept or enter a fourth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/3/2019. (jls)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint (Agreed to by all Parties) by Defendants Darice, Inc., The Michaels Companies, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Giftos, Melinda)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answer due 9/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/21/2019. (jls)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint (Agreed to by all Parties) by Defendants Darice, Inc., The Michaels Companies, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Giftos, Melinda)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answer due 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/6/2019. (jls)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Defendants Darice, Inc., The Michaels Companies, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Giftos, Melinda) Modified on 8/5/2019. (lak)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Natalia Kruse for Defendants Darice, Inc., The Michaels Companies, Inc. (Kruse, Natalia) Modified on 8/5/2019: Signed by Melinda S. Giftos. (lak)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Melinda S. Giftos for Defendants Darice, Inc., The Michaels Companies, Inc. (Giftos, Melinda)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Darice, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Tomaselli, Anthony)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. The Michaels Companies, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Tomaselli, Anthony)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Darice, Inc. and The Michaels Companies, Inc. (jls)
July 15, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
July 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Flambeau, Inc. (Tomaselli, Anthony)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Darice, Inc., The Michaels Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2500910.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # D633,294, issued 3/1/2011, held by Flambeau, Inc., filed by Flambeau, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Merchant 7 Case, #2 Exhibit 2 - Merchant 10 Case, #3 Exhibit 3 - Merchant 12 Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - Merchant 15 Case, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tradesman 10 Case, #6 Exhibit 6 - Tradesman 14 Case, #7 Exhibit 7 - Tradesman 17 Case, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Design Patent No. 633,294, #9 Exhibit 9 - Darice Website Printout, #10 Exhibit 10 - Embossing Essentials Case Photographs, #11 Exhibit 11 - Trade Dress Claims Chart, #12 Exhibit 12 - Patent Claims Chart, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Tomaselli, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flambeau, Inc. v. The Michaels Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Michaels Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda S. Giftos
Represented By: Natalia Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darice, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda S. Giftos
Represented By: Natalia Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flambeau, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony A. Tomaselli
Represented By: Anita Marie Boor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?