Cloud 1, LLC v. La Crosse County Board of Supervisors et al
Plaintiff: Cloud 1, LLC
Defendant: La Crosse County Board of Supervisors and La Crosse County, Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00590
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to La Crosse County Board of Supervisors, La Crosse County, Wisconsin. (kwf)
July 23, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
July 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Cloud 1, LLC. (Carter, Rodney)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against La Crosse County Board of Supervisors, La Crosse County, Wisconsin, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2506567.), filed by Cloud 1, LLC, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - La Crosse Board of Supervisors, #3 Summons - La Crosse County) (Carter, Rodney) Modified on 7/23/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cloud 1, LLC v. La Crosse County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Crosse County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Crosse County, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloud 1, LLC
Represented By: Rodney W. Carter
Represented By: James C. Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?