Downey, Mark v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: National Association of Tax Preparers, DOJ and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00596
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Signed copy of #1 Complaint filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Signed copy of #1 - #1 Complaint for a Civil Case, #2 Envelope) (nln),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/29/2019. (rks),(ps)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk's Office returning #1 Complaint for signature. (rks),(ps)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure list, IRS Income Tax Form, Letter regarding Schedule A Disability Certification) (rks),(ps)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Mark Downey. (rks),(ps)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Quash Sovereign Immunity; Motion to Accommodate the Disabled; Motion to Expedite & Seal; Motion to Refer Criminal Case to the US Attorney; Motion to Designate the Primary Defendant for the Defendant Class Action Claim by Plaintiff Mark Downey. (rks),(ps)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Statement of Claim filed by Mark Downey. (rks),(ps)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (unsigned) against All Defendants, filed by Mark Downey. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint for a Civil Case, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey, Mark v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Tax Preparers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David Daly Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?