Rolandson, Sandra v. Kostka & Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Rolandson
Defendant: Kostka & Associates LLC and Timothy L. Kostka, Esq.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00603
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties have informed the court that they have reached a settlement and will file dismissal papers within 30 days. Dkt. #4 . Based on the reported settlement, the court will dismiss the case now without prejudice. Either party may move to reopen the case for good cause. And if the parties file a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice within 30 days, the court will enter an order dismissing the case on those terms. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/17/2019. (jls)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Sandra Rolandson. (Lyons, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
August 15, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER by Defendants Kostka & Associates LLC, Timothy L. Kostka, Esq. (Newman, Patrick)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kostka & Associates LLC and Timothy L. Kostka, Esq. (jls)
July 25, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
July 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 Undated COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Kostka & Associates LLC, Timothy L. Kostka, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2508094.), filed by Sandra Rolandson. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lyons, Thomas) Modified on 7/25/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolandson, Sandra v. Kostka & Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rolandson
Represented By: Thomas John Lyons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kostka & Associates LLC
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L. Kostka, Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Daniel Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?