Carter, Robert et al v. United States Trustee
Appellant: Robert Earl Carter, Robert E. McDonald and Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos
Appellee: United States Trustee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00610
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by Appellee United States Trustee as to #9 Brief in Opposition. (Gulden, Cameron),(ps)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Appellee United States Trustee re: #4 Motion for Leave to Appeal filed by Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos, Robert Earl Carter (Gulden, Cameron),(ps)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Appeal Record from Bankruptcy Court case number 1813695. Documents from the Bankruptcy case can be found #here. (Attachments: #1 Appellee Designation of Contents, #2 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet) (jef),(ps)
August 28, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to Appellants' #4 Motion for Leave to Appeal. Appellee U.S. Trustee's Response due 9/6/2019. (jef),(ps)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Appellee United States Trustee's motion for extension of time to respond to appellants' motion for leave to appeal, dkt. #6 , is DENIED as unnecessary. The court has not set a deadline on appellants' motion for leave to appeal at dkt. #4 , so the U.S. Trustee has no deadline to respond to this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/8/2019. (jef),(ps)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Leave to Appeal by Appellee United States Trustee. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gulden, Cameron),(ps)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Cameron M Gulden for Appellee United States Trustee. (Gulden, Cameron),(ps)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appeal by Appellants Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos, Robert Earl Carter. (nln),(ps)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Amended Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-18-13695, filed by Robert Earl Carter, Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (nln),(ps)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis / Motion Requesting Permission to Pay the Appeal Fee in Installments by Appellant Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos. (Motion originally filed at dkt. #1 - #3 ) (nln),(ps) (nln).
July 25, 2019 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (nln)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 1-18-13695. Filed by Robert Earl Carter, Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet, #3 Motion Requesting Permission to Pay the Notice of Appeal Fee in Installments) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter, Robert et al v. United States Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert Earl Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert E. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Casandra Ivelisse Barral Borgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Mary Ruth Jensen
Represented By: Cameron M Gulden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?