Walker, Jerome v. Shannon, Robert et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Walker
Defendant: Lt. Fischer, Nurse Doe, CO Robert Shannon, HSM Jolinda Waterman, John/Jane Doe and NP Mcardle
Not Yet Classified: WSPF Prison Facility and GBCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00613
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (jef),(ps)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
August 5, 2019 Partial Filing fee received: $22.44, receipt number 34690035065. (nln),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 22.44 assessed due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/29/2019. (rks),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (rks),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerome Walker. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (rks),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker, Jerome v. Shannon, Robert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Robert Shannon
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSM Jolinda Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Mcardle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: GBCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?