Nadler, Joel v. Maki, Andrew
Plaintiff: Joel C. Nadler
Defendant: Jake Mack, Andrew J. Maki and Andrea A. Nodolf
Case Number: 3:2019cv00616
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Record by Circuit Court of Dunn County. (jef),(ps)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Record sent to Circuit Court of Dunn County. (jef),(ps)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that these cases are REMANDED to the Circuit Court for Dunn County, Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/20/2019. (jef),(ps)
August 12, 2019 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 34690035124. (nln),(ps)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff Joel Nadler enclosing $400 filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Copy of #3 Order) (nln),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing plaintiff to submit $400 filing fee or a Financial Affidavit by 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/29/2019. (jef),(ps)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Affidavit of Joel C. Nadler. (Attachments: #1 Dunn County Citation and Complaint, Sheriff's Office Report, Statement) (jef)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Action at Law, Removal for Cause from Circuit Court of Dunn County, case number 18-cm-322, filed by Joel C. Nadler. (Attachments: #1 File on Demand, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Cover sheet, #4 Affidavit of service, #5 Envelope) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadler, Joel v. Maki, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Maki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea A. Nodolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel C. Nadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?