Fetty, Lori v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Lori Fetty
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00642
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Duncan, Dana)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office) (voc) Modified on 8/7/2019. (lak)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/7/2019. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (voc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lori Fetty. (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 8/6/2019: Corrected filer. (lak)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Lori Fetty, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 8/6/2019: Corrected shell case opening, parties and docket entry. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fetty, Lori v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Fetty
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?