Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc. v. Brown, Ryan
Appellant: Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc.
Appellee: Ryan Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00652
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Support due 10/15/2019. Brief in Opposition due 11/14/2019. Brief in Reply due 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/2019. (voc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief by Appellant Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Christianson, Joshua)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Appeal Record from Bankruptcy Court case number 18-11344-7. Documents from the Bankruptcy case can be found #here. Brief in Support due 9/30/2019. Brief in Opposition due 10/29/2019. Brief in Reply due 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Docket, #2 Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record on Appeal) (voc)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Appellant Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc. (Christianson, Joshua)
August 7, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-11344. Filed by Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet) (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc. v. Brown, Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Island City Snowmobile & ATV Club, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ryan Brown
Represented By: Evan Mart Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?