Kaseno, George et al v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: George A. Kaseno and Carla L. Kaseno
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00653
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
September 18, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 9/27/2019. (lak)
September 16, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Johnson, Alyssa)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #6 Stipulation for Extension to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. Midland Credit Management, Inc. answer due 9/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/30/2019. (jls)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by David M. Schultz for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Schultz, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension to File Answer by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Johnson, Alyssa) Modified on 8/30/2019. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Johnson, Alyssa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Alyssa A. Johnson for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Johnson, Alyssa)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Lein, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (jls)
August 9, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
August 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2517374.), filed by George A. Kaseno, Carla L. Kaseno, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Representation Letter, #2 Exhibit B - MCM Letter, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 8/8/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaseno, George et al v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. Kaseno
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla L. Kaseno
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Alyssa A. Johnson
Represented By: David M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?