Foster, James v. Foster, Ericka
Plaintiff: James M. Foster
Defendant: Ericka K. Foster
Case Number: 3:2019cv00656
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Motions in Limine due 11/4/2019. Response to Motion due 11/12/2019. Final Pretrial Submissions due 11/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 04:00 PM. Court Trial set for 12/4/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/1/2019. (voc)
October 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2019 [:10] (cak)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Respondent Ericka K. Foster, Petitioner James M. Foster. (Hazen, Rhonda)
September 4, 2019 Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER by Ericka K. Foster. (Loeb, Jordan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service. Ericka K. Foster served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Hazen, Rhonda)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ericka K. Foster. (jat)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by James M. Foster. (Hazen, Rhonda)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James M. Foster. (Hazen, Rhonda)
August 9, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat)
August 9, 2019 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
August 9, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jat)
August 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Petition for Return of Children under the Hague Convention on Civil Remedies for International Child Abduction) against Ericka K. Foster, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2518006.), filed by James M. Foster, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ericka Foster (Pages 2 and 4 are blank.), #2 Exhibit B - Temporary Order, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Code - Partial (Pages 2 and 4 are blank.) (Hazen, Rhonda) Modified on 8/9/2019. (lak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (jat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster, James v. Foster, Ericka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericka K. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Foster
Represented By: Rhonda Rose Hazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?