Shanley, Mark et al v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Shanley, Mark Shanley and American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc., XYZ Insurance Company and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00664
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Erin Whitney Grewe Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/18/2019. (lak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Admit Erin Whitney Grewe Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2542938.) by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. (Grewe, Erin) Modified on 9/18/2019: Added the Attorney To Be Noticed designation. (lak)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge Stephen L. Crocker attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 10/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due 6/15/2020. Settlement Letters due 9/25/2020. Motions in Limine due 10/2/2020. Response to Motion due 10/16/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/18/2019. (jls)
September 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 9/17/2019 [:10] (cak)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/17/2019. (lak)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Disregard. Single party consent. Not to be e-filed. Modified on 9/17/2019. (lak)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul Thomas Falk for Plaintiffs American Family Mutual Insurance Company, Amy Shanley, Mark Shanley. (Falk, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
August 14, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
August 14, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony Anzelmo for Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. (Anzelmo, Anthony)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Omega Flex, Inc. (Heitkamp, Margaret)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Omega Flex, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet. (Heitkamp, Margaret) Modified on 8/13/2019. (lak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from La Crosse County Circuit Court, case number 19-CV-54. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2519769), filed by Omega Flex, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - EFN to Omega Flex, #3 Exhibit 3 - EFN to Ziegler Heating, #4 Exhibit 4 - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Falk, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Falk, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul T. Falk, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Appearance of Brent Smith for Ziegler, #8 Exhibit 8 - ENSC - Brent Smith, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Appearance of Eugene LaFlamme for Ziegler, #10 Exhibit 10 - ENSC - Eugene LaFlamme, #11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Appearance of Jacob Kempowski for Ziegler, #12 Exhibit 12 - ENSC - Jacob Kempowski, #13 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Appearance of Anthony Anzelmo for Omega Flex, #14 Exhibit 14 - Omega Flex's Answer to Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15 - Notice of Appearance of Margaret Heitkamp for Omega Flex, #16 Exhibit 16 - Ziegler's Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim, #17 Exhibit 17 - Notice of Withdrawal of Brent Smith for Ziegler, #18 Exhibit 18 - Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Brent Smith, #19 Exhibit 19 - Order Approving Withdrawal of Brent Smith, #20 Exhibit 20 - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Grewe, #21 Exhibit 21 - Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proof of Payment to Office of Lawyer Regulation, #22 Exhibit 22 - Affidavit of Anthony Anzelmo in Support of Erin Grewe's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #23 Exhibit 23 - Affidavit of Erin Grewe in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #24 Exhibit 24 - Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Grewe, #25 Exhibit 25 - Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Grewe, #26 Exhibit 26 - Ziegler's Motion for Summary Judgment, #27 Exhibit 27 - Ziegler's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #28 Exhibit 28 - Affidavit of Jacob Kempowski in Support of Ziegler's Motion, #29 Exhibit 29 - Affidavit of Duane Ziegler in Support Ziegler's Motion, #30 Exhibit 30 - Notice of Hearing on Summary Judgment, #31 Exhibit 31 - Notice of Rescheduled Hearing on Summary Judgment, #32 Exhibit 32 - Attorney Falk's Request to Appear by Phone at Hearing, #33 Exhibit 33 - Attorney Heitkamp's Request to Appear by Phone at Hearing, #34 Exhibit 34 - Shanley/AmFam's Response to Ziegler's Motion, #35 Exhibit 35 - Minutes from Summary Judgment Hearing, #36 Exhibit 36 - Letter from Attorney Kempowski Filing Proposed Order, #37 Exhibit 37 - Proposed Order Granting Ziegler's Motion, #38 Exhibit 38 - Order Granting Ziegler's Motion, #39 Exhibit 39 - Ziegler's First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiffs, #40 Exhibit 40 - Omega Flex's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, #41 Exhibit 41 - Omega Flex's First Set of Request for Production, #42 Exhibit 42 - Omega Flex's Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Heitkamp, Margaret) Modified on 8/13/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanley, Mark et al v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Kathryn Heitkamp
Represented By: Erin Whitney Grewe
Represented By: Anthony Anzelmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Shanley
Represented By: Carl Edward Metz, II
Represented By: Paul Thomas Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Shanley
Represented By: Carl Edward Metz, II
Represented By: Paul Thomas Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Carl Edward Metz, II
Represented By: Paul Thomas Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?