Wisconsin Whey Protein v. Lawrence, Robert et al
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Whey Protein
Defendant: John Vandenbraak, Robert Lawrence, Todd Dumanski, Dr. Lawrence Labs, L.L.C., Jeffrey Whitt and New Horizon Nutraceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00667
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to New Horizon Nutraceuticals, LLC. (arw)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER striking #9 Second Amended Complaint. The clerk's office is directed to add New Horizon Nutraceuticals, LLC as a defendant and issue a summons to plaintiff for that defendant. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file promptly proof of service for defendant Todd Dumanski and endeavor to serve the remaining defendants as soon as possible. Once served, plaintiff should file promptly proofs of service for those defendants. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2019. (arw)
October 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/8/2019 [:20] (mfh)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of a letter from plaintiff's counsel, now docketed as dkt. #10 . In light of plaintiff's counsel's travel plans, the court will reschedule the telephonic status conference to Tuesday, October 8, 2019, at 11:00 AM. The purpose of this conference is solely to discuss plaintiff's amended pleadings. Once defendants are served and have answered the complaint, the court will schedule a preliminary pretrial conference with Magistrate Judge Crocker. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for initiating the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/4/2019. (arw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from plaintiff Wisconsin Whey Protein regarding 10/7/2019 Telephone Status Conference. (Fay, John)
October 2, 2019 Set Status Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 11:45 AM before District Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. (arw/mfh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT [SECOND] against All Defendants, filed by Wisconsin Whey Protein. (Fay, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Wisconsin Whey Protein. (Fay, John)
September 29, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Wisconsin Whey Protein. (Fay, John)
September 29, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wisconsin Whey Protein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Exhibits to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Bill of Lading -02-02-17, #3 Exhibit Receipt of Delivery -02/17/17, #4 Exhibit Purchase Order - P1864 - 03/03/17, #5 Exhibit Bill of Lading - 03/08/17, #6 Exhibit Receipt of Delivery -03/10/17, #7 Exhibit Return of Certified Mails, #8 Exhibit Invoice PO 1820 -02-07-17, #9 Exhibit Invoice PO 1864- 03/08/17, #10 Exhibit Purcahse Order -P1820 -02/02/17) (Fay, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dr. Lawrence Labs, L.L.C., Robert Lawrence, Todd Dumanski, John Vandenbraak, and Jeffrey Whitt. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Robert Lawrence, #2 Summons - Todd Dumanski, #3 Summons - John Vandenbraak, #4 Summons - Jeffrey Whitt) (arw)
August 16, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
August 16, 2019 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2520341) filed by Wisconsin Whey Protein. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Purchase Order - P1820 - 02/02/17, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Bill of Lading - 02/02/17 - Purchase Order 1820, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Receipt of Delivery - 02/17/17 - Purchase Order 1820, #5 Exhibit B-1 - Purchase Order - P-1854 - 03/03/17, #6 Exhibit B-2 - Bill of Lading - 03/08/17 - Purchase Order P-1864, #7 Exhibit B-3 - Receipt of Delivery - 03/10/17 - Purchase Order P-1864, #8 Exhibit B-4 - Return of Certified Mailings, #9 Exhibit D-1 - Invoice - PO 1820 - 02/07/17, #10 Exhibit D-2 - Invoice - PO-1864 - 03/08/17, #11 Summons - Dr. Lawrence Labs, LLC, #12 Summons - Robert Lawrence, #13 Summons - Todd Dumanski, #14 Summons - John Vandenbraak, #15 Summons - Jeffrey Whitt) (Fay, John) Modified on 8/15/2019. (lak)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit John Farrell Fay Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2019. (lak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disregard; refiled as #4 COMPLAINT. Modified on 8/16/2019. (arw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Motion to Admit John Farrell Fay Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2520336.) by Plaintiff Wisconsin Whey Protein. (Fay, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Whey Protein v. Lawrence, Robert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vandenbraak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dumanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lawrence Labs, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Horizon Nutraceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Whey Protein
Represented By: John Farrell Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?