Williams Butler, Kenneth v. Brown County Circuits Court of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Kenneth Erral Williams Butler and Kenneth Ernal Williams Butler
Defendant: Brown County Circuits Court of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00684
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Letter from Plaintiff Kenneth Williams Butler re: initial partial payment. (nln),(ps)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting plaintiff Kenneth Ernal Williams Butler's #5 request for extension of time. Initial partial filing fee is now due 10/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/18/2019. (jef),(ps)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from plaintiff regarding the initial partial filing fee and clarifying the spelling of plaintiff's middle name, Ernal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 20.15 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/23/2019. (jef),(ps)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Kenneth Erral Williams Butler. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth Erral Williams Butler. (jef),(ps)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brown County Circuits Court of Green Bay, Wisconsin., filed by Kenneth Erral Williams Butler. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Inmate request for medical care) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams Butler, Kenneth v. Brown County Circuits Court of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Erral Williams Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ernal Williams Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown County Circuits Court of Green Bay, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?