Metzger, Ted v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Ted Metzger
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00694
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew M. Saul served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Traver, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (jls)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2019. (jls)
August 27, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jls)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ted Metzger. (Traver, David) Modified on 8/27/2019: Missing case number. (lak)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Ted Metzger, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Attorney General, #3 Summons - SSA, #4 Summons - U.S. Attorney) (Traver, David) Modified on 8/27/2019: Corrected the Cause of Action. Summonses missing case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metzger, Ted v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Metzger
Represented By: David F. Traver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?