Jones, Brenda v. York, Brent et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Jones
Defendant: As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department, Brent York and Adams County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00699
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
October 23, 2019 Action Requested: If you have not already provided your #Consent to Magistrate/Request for Reassignment form, please do so by 11/13/2019. (lak)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 Brief in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Adams County Sheriff's Department. (Spoto, Marcella) Modified on 10/24/2019. (kwf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Adams County Sheriff's Department. Brief in Opposition due 11/13/2019. Brief in Reply due 11/25/2019. (Spoto, Marcella) Modified on 10/24/2019. (kwf)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants Adams County Sheriff's Department, As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department, Brent York. (Spoto, Marcella)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Adams County Sheriff's Department. Adams County Sheriff's Department waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Hall, Samuel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department. As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Hall, Samuel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Brent York. Brent York waiver sent on 9/4/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Hall, Samuel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew C. Goldner for Defendants Adams County Sheriff's Department, As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department, Brent York. (Goldner, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Marcella S. Spoto for Defendants Adams County Sheriff's Department, As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department, Brent York. (Spoto, Marcella)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel C. Hall, Jr., for Defendants Adams County Sheriff's Department, As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department, Brent York. (Hall, Samuel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Adams County Sheriff's Department, As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department, Brent York. (kwf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Brenda Jones. (Goldman, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Brenda Jones. (Goldman, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Brenda Jones. (Goldman, Lisa)
August 29, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
August 29, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2529277.) Filed by Brenda Jones, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goldman, Lisa) Modified on 8/28/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones, Brenda v. York, Brent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: As-of-Yet Unknown Employees of Adams County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew C. Goldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent York
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew C. Goldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Marcella S. Spoto
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew C. Goldner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jones
Represented By: Bruce M. Davey
Represented By: Lisa Claire Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?