Knutson, Michael v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Michael Knutson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00718
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily Skutch Cohn for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cohn, Emily)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf)
October 7, 2019 $400 filing fee paid; receipt number 0758-2553828. (Duncan, Dana)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due 10/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/5/2019. (kwf)
September 5, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf)
September 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Redacted Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Knutson. (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 9/4/2019. (lak)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Michael Knutson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 9/4/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knutson, Michael v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Knutson
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?