Buell, Virginia v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Virginia M Buell
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00747
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed. (Schultz, Barry)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 10/10/2019: Return not attached. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Schultz, Barry)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **This court's new general practice is to schedule social security cases for oral argument. To facilitate scheduling, the parties must file a joint notice stating their availability for oral argument. The notice must be filed within 10 days after plaintiff submits a reply brief (or within 10 days after the reply deadline if plaintiff does not file a reply) and the notice must identify three dates on which the parties would be available. After plaintiff's reply brief is due, the parties should consult and propose dates in June or July of 2020 for oral argument; the court prefers Thursdays or Fridays at 10:00 AM. If the parties have good cause for not being available on three days within the required window, then they may request a different date. After the parties file their notice, the court will notify them if and when it intends to hold oral argument. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2019. (arw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily Skutch Cohn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Cohn, Emily)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (arw)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 9/16/2019. (arw)
September 12, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
September 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. (arw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Virginia M Buell. (Schultz, Barry)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Virginia M Buell. (Schultz, Barry)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Virginia M. Buell. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses) (Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buell, Virginia v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia M Buell
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?