Jackson, Calvin v. Roehl Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Jackson
Defendant: Roehl Transport, Inc. and Roehl RDTC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00758
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/10/2019. (rks),(ps)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Calvin Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rks),(ps)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Amended Financial Affidavit due 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/18/2019. (jef),(ps)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Calvin Jackson. (jef),(ps)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calvin Jackson, filed by Calvin Jackson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson, Calvin v. Roehl Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roehl Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roehl RDTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?