DeShannon, Shannon v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Shannon DeShannon
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00777
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Plaintiff Shannon DeShannon. Fee due 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 10/22/2019. (arw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay the Filing Fee by Plaintiff Shannon DeShannon. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. Response due 10/28/2019. (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 10/21/2019: Date. (lak)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **In a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , plaintiff reports average monthly income from self-employment in the amount of $3000. Plaintiff reports no expenses, no assets, and no debts, but her total income is considerably less: only $580 per month. Plaintiff may have until 10/21/2019 to pay the filing fee or provide additional information from which the court can determine her actual income. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer on 9/26/2019. (arw)
September 23, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
September 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. (arw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shannon DeShannon. (Duncan, Dana)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Shannon DeShannon, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 9/17/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeShannon, Shannon v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon DeShannon
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?