United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC, Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC, Michael G. Hull, Chrysalis Financial LLC and Christopher J. Nohl
Case Number: 3:2019cv00809
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Romashko for Defendants Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC, Chrysalis Financial LLC, Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC, Michael G. Hull, Christopher J. Nohl. (Romashko, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick S. Coffey for Defendants Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC, Chrysalis Financial LLC, Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC, Michael G. Hull, Christopher J. Nohl. (Coffey, Patrick)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Christopher J. Nohl. Christopher J. Nohl waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (White, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Michael G. Hull. Michael G. Hull waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (White, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC. Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (White, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Chrysalis Financial LLC. Chrysalis Financial LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (White, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC. Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (White, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Waiver of Service sent to Christopher J. Nohl on September 30, 2019 by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver of Service due 10/30/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Waiver of Service sent to Michael G. Hull on September 30, 2019 by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver of Service due 10/30/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Waiver of Service sent to Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC on September 30, 2019 by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver of Service due 10/30/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Waiver of Service sent to Chrysalis Financial LLC on September 30, 2019 by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver of Service due 10/30/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Waiver of Service sent to Bluepoint Investment Counsel on September 30, 2019 by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Waiver of Service due 10/30/2019. (Hutton, Doressia)
October 1, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
October 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Howard White for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (White, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Doressia LaShun Hutton for Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Hutton, Doressia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. Filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hutton, Doressia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Asset Management II LLC
Represented By: Patrick S. Coffey
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluepoint Investment Counsel, LLC
Represented By: Patrick S. Coffey
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Hull
Represented By: David L. Axelrod
Represented By: Patrick S. Coffey
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysalis Financial LLC
Represented By: Patrick S. Coffey
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Nohl
Represented By: Patrick S. Coffey
Represented By: Robert Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Doressia LaShun Hutton
Represented By: Christopher Howard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?