United States of America v. Estate of James L. Riehle (Deceased) et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joseph A. Riehle and Estate of James L. Riehle (Deceased)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00837
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Joseph A. Riehle. Joseph A. Riehle waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Oswald, Barbara)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Estate of James L. Riehle (Deceased). Estate of James L. Riehle (Deceased) waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Oswald, Barbara) Modified on 12/2/2019. (arw)
October 16, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
October 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibits to #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America. Exhibit AA - 09.27.2016 Assumption Agreement, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AB - 09.27.2016 Assumption Agreement, #2 Exhibit AC - 09.27.2016 Assumption Agreement, #3 Exhibit AD - Notice of Acceleration, #4 Exhibit AE - Termination of Decendant's Interest) (Oswald, Barbara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 04.22.2015 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - 04.22.2015 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 04.22.2015 Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit D - 03.21.2014 Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit E - 03.21.2014 Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit F - 01.28.2011 Promissory Note, #8 Exhibit G - 01.28.2011 Promissory Note, #9 Exhibit H - 04.23.2010 Promissory Note, #10 Exhibit I - 07.15.2009 Promissory Note, #11 Exhibit J - 09.29.2016 Mortgage, #12 Exhibit K - 04.24.2015 Mortgage, #13 Exhibit L - 03.26.2014 Mortgage, #14 Exhibit M - 04.01.2013 Mortgage, #15 Exhibit N - 02.17.2012 Mortgage, #16 Exhibit O - 02.02.2011 Mortgage, #17 Exhibit P - 04.27.2010 Mortgage, #18 Exhibit Q - 07.16.2009 Mortgage, #19 Exhibit R - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #20 Exhibit S - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #21 Exhibit T - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #22 Exhibit U - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #23 Exhibit V - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #24 Exhibit W - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #25 Exhibit X - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #26 Exhibit Y - 02.15.2009 Partial Release, #27 Exhibit Z - 09.27.2016 Assumption Agreement) (Oswald, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Estate of James L. Riehle (Deceased) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Riehle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James L. Riehle (Deceased)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?