Anderson, Derek v. Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc.
Plaintiff: Derek S. Anderson
Defendant: Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00843
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Derek S. Anderson. (Lein, Matthew)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Derek S. Anderson. (Lein, Matthew) (Main Document replaced and additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal) (lak)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Disregard; see #5 for Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Modified on 12/3/2019. (kwf)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc., served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 11/8/2019. (lak)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc. (jls)
October 9, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
October 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2554840.), filed by Derek S. Anderson, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England Inc. Corporate Records, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fax Confirmation, #3 Exhibit 3A - Partially Redacted Experian Credit Report, #4 Exhibit 3B - Transunion Report, #5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons) (Lein, Matthew) Modified on 10/9/2019: Jury demand, etc. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, Derek v. Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek S. Anderson
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fair Collections & Outsourcing of New England, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?