Coplin, Benjamin v. Bruck Law Offices, S.C. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Coplin
Defendant: University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc., State Collection Service, Inc. and Bruck Law Offices, S.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00910
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (voc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Undated). (Dillon, Duffy) Modified on 12/20/2019. (lak)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #11 Second Stipulation to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The parties should not expect a third extension. Bruck Law Offices, S.C. answer due 12/30/2019; University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc. answer due 12/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/5/2019. (kwf)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulation to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendant University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc. (Wittenberg, Christa)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and granting #9 Stipulation to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Bruck Law Offices, S.C. answer due 12/6/2019; University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc. answer due 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/2/2019. (kwf)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulation to Extend the Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Bruck Law Offices, S.C., University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc. (Wittenberg, Christa) Modified on 12/2/2019. (kwf)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Christa Diane Wittenberg for Defendant University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc.. (Wittenberg, Christa)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Duffy Dillon for Defendant Bruck Law Offices, S.C. (Dillon, Duffy)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Allen Watts for Defendant State Collection Service, Inc. (Watts, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bruck Law Offices, S.C., State Collection Service, Inc., University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc. (kwf)
November 8, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
November 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Benjamin Coplin. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruck Law Offices, S.C., State Collection Service, Inc., University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2572902.), filed by Benjamin Coplin, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Bruck Law Offices, S.C., #3 Summons - State Collection Service, Inc., #4 Summons - University of WI Medical Foundation, Inc.) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 11/7/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coplin, Benjamin v. Bruck Law Offices, S.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Wisconsin Medical Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Christa Diane Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Collection Service, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Allen Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruck Law Offices, S.C.
Represented By: Duffy Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Coplin
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Represented By: Zeshan Usman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?