Exact Sciences Corporation v. The Johns Hopkins University
Plaintiff: Exact Sciences Corporation
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Case Number: 3:2019cv00920
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant The Johns Hopkins University. The Johns Hopkins University waiver sent on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/18/2020. (Raynal, Lazar)
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Kristin Graham Noel re: Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation (Noel, Kristin)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Motion to Admit Lazar Raynal Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Admit Kaitlin Sheehan Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion to Admit Amanda Antons Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/20/2019. (lak)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Admit Amanda Antons Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2581156.) by Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Antons, Amanda)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Admit Kaitlin Sheehan Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2581153.) by Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sheehan, Kaitlin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Admit Lazar Raynal Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2581143.) by Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Raynal, Lazar)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/12/2019. (kwf)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Johns Hopkins University. (kwf)
November 12, 2019 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
November 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation. (Noel, Kristin)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Seal #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation. (Noel, Kristin)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Redaction to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Exact Sciences Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended and Restated License Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fourth Amendment, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fifth Amendment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sixth Amendment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Seventh Amendment, #9 Exhibit 9 - Eighth Amendment, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 6,440,706, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 6,753,147, #12 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 7,824,889, #13 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent No. 7,915,015, #14 Exhibit 14 - U.S. Patent No. 8,859,206, #15 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 9,970,058, #16 Exhibit 16 - U.S. Patent No. 7,910,300, #17 Exhibit 17 - U.S. Patent No. 8,669,062, #18 Exhibit 18 - U.S. Patent No. 9,328,343, #19 Exhibit 19- U.S. Patent No. 8.048,627, #20 Exhibit 20 - U.S. Patent No. 8,026,053, #21 Exhibit 21 - U.S. Patent No. 8,709,723, #22 Exhibit 22 - U.S. Patent No. 8,715,934, #23 Exhibit 23 - U.S. Patent No. 8,741,573, #24 Exhibit 24 - U.S. Patent No. 9,260,751, #25 Exhibit 25 - U.S. Patent No. 9,360,526, #26 Exhibit 26 - U.S. Patent No. 9,551,037, #27 Exhibit 27 - U.S. Patent No. 10,150,991, #28 Exhibit 28 - U.S. Patent No. 10,422,006, #29 Exhibit 29 - February 3, 2015 Letter, #30 Exhibit 30 - October 20, 2015 Email, #31 Exhibit 31- March 25, 2019 Letter, #32 Exhibit 32 - April 19, 2019 Letter, #33 Exhibit 33 - May 24, 2019 Letter, #34 Exhibit 34 - August 15, 2019 Letter, #35 Summons, #36 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #37 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Noel, Kristin)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against The Johns Hopkins University. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2574448.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6,440,706, issued 08/27/2002, held by The Johns Hopkins University; Patent # 6,753,147, issued 06/22/2004, held by The Johns Hopkins University; Patent # 7,824,889, issued 11/02/2010, held by The Johns Hopkins University; Patent # 7,915,015, issued 03/29/2011, held by National Institutes of Health; Patent # 8,859,206, issued 10/14/2014, held by National Institutes of Health; (Sealed Document), filed by Exact Sciences Corporation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - License Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended and Restated License Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fourth Amendment, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fifth Amendment, #7 Exhibit 7 - Sixth Amendment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Seventh Amendment, #9 Exhibit 9 - Eighth Amendment, #10 Exhibit 10 - U.S. Patent No. 6,440,706, #11 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 6,753,147, #12 Exhibit 12 - U.S. Patent No. 7,824,889, #13 Exhibit 13 - U.S. Patent No. 7,915,015, #14 Exhibit 14 - U.S. Patent No. 8,859,206, #15 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 9,970,058, #16 Exhibit 16 - U.S. Patent No. 7,910,300, #17 Exhibit 17 - U.S. Patent No. 8,669,062, #18 Exhibit 18 - U.S. Patent No. 9,328,343, #19 Exhibit 19 - U.S. Patent No. 8.048,627, #20 Exhibit 20 - U.S. Patent No. 8,026,053, #21 Exhibit 21 - U.S. Patent No. 8,709,723, #22 Exhibit 22 - U.S. Patent No. 8,715,934, #23 Exhibit 23 - U.S. Patent No. 8,741,573, #24 Exhibit 24 - U.S. Patent No. 9,260,751, #25 Exhibit 25 - U.S. Patent No. 9,360,526, #26 Exhibit 26 - U.S. Patent No. 9,551,037, #27 Exhibit 27 - U.S. Patent No. 10,150,991, #28 Exhibit 28 - U.S. Patent No. 10,422,006, #29 Exhibit 29 - February 3, 2015 Letter, #30 Exhibit 30 - October 20, 2015 Email, #31 Exhibit 31 - March 25, 2019 Letter, #32 Exhibit 32 - April 19, 2019 Letter, #33 Exhibit 33 - May 24, 2019 Letter, #34 Exhibit 34 - August 15, 2019 Letter, #35 Summons, #36 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #37 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Noel, Kristin) Modified on 11/12/2019. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exact Sciences Corporation v. The Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exact Sciences Corporation
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Lazar Raynal
Represented By: Kaitlin Sheehan
Represented By: Amanda Antons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?