The Andrew Goodman Foundation v. Bostelmann, Marge et al
Plaintiff: The Andrew Goodman Foundation
Defendant: Mark L. Thomsen, Dean Knudson, Ann S. Jacobs, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey and Robert F. Spindell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00955
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 Motion to Reschedule the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference and Related Proceedings by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Response due 1/22/2020. (Kawski, Clayton) Modified on 1/15/2020. (lak)
January 14, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
January 8, 2020 Filing 20 Brief in Reply by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr., Mark L. Thomsen in Support of #9 Motion to Stay. (Kawski, Clayton)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Kawski, Clayton)
December 24, 2019 Filing 18 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff The Andrew Goodman Foundation re: #9 Motion to Stay filed by Dean Knudson, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Mark L. Thomsen, Robert F. Spindell, Jr., Ann S. Jacobs. (Callais, Amanda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Mark L. Thomsen. Mark L. Thomsen waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Anstaett, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Robert F. Spindell, Jr. Robert F. Spindell, Jr. waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Anstaett, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Dean Knudson. Dean Knudson waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Anstaett, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Ann S. Jacobs. Ann S. Jacobs waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Anstaett, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Julie M. Glancey. Julie M. Glancey waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Anstaett, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Marge Bostelmann. Marge Bostelmann waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Anstaett, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Sean Michael Murphy for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr., Mark L. Thomsen. (Murphy, Sean)
December 5, 2019 Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #9 Motion to Stay. Brief in Opposition due 12/24/2019. Brief in Reply due 1/8/2020. (rks/slc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Brief in Support of #9 Motion to Stay by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Kawski, Clayton)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Stay by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Response due 12/11/2019. (Kawski, Clayton)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Clayton P. Kawski for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Kawski, Clayton)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Stephanie Command Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Admit Gillian Kuhlmann Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Admit Yael Bromberg Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/21/2019. (lak)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Yael Bromberg Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2581718.) by Plaintiff The Andrew Goodman Foundation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Bromberg, Yael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Gillian Kuhlmann Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2581717.) by Plaintiff The Andrew Goodman Foundation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Kuhlmann, Gillian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Stephanie Command Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2581705.) by Plaintiff The Andrew Goodman Foundation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Command, Stephanie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marge Bostelmann, et al. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Julie M. Glancey, #2 Summons as to Ann S. Jacobs, #3 Summons as to Dean Knudson, #4 Summons as to Robert F. Spindell, Jr., #5 Summons as to Mark L. Thomsen) (rks)
November 20, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
November 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Andrew Goodman Foundation. (Anstaett, David)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2580624.), filed by The Andrew Goodman Foundation, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Bostelmann, #3 Summons - Glancey, #4 Summons - Jacobs, #5 Summons - Knudson, #6 Summons - Spindell, Jr., #7 Summons - Thomsen) (Anstaett, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Andrew Goodman Foundation v. Bostelmann, Marge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Thomsen
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Clayton P. Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Knudson
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Clayton P. Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann S. Jacobs
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Clayton P. Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marge Bostelmann
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Clayton P. Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie M. Glancey
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Clayton P. Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Spindell, Jr.
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Clayton P. Kawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Andrew Goodman Foundation
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Stephanie Command
Represented By: Gillian Kuhlmann
Represented By: Yael Bromberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?