Lindsey, Carlos v. Boughton, Gary, et al
Plaintiff: Carlos D Lindsey and Carlos Lindsey
Defendant: Lebbeus Brown, Gary Boughton, Mark Kartman and Steven Schneider
Not Yet Classified: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00963
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants dismissing the case. (rks),(ps)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that cases 19-cv-962-jdp and 19-cv-963-jdp are DISMISSED for plaintiff Carlos Lindsey's failure to allege that he is in imminent danger of serious physical harm as required by the sanction issued in Lindsey v. Johnston, No. 18-cv-398, 2018 WL 66062417 (W.D. Wis. Dec. 17, 2018). The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close these cases. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/26/2019. (rks),(ps)
November 25, 2019 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (nln),(ps)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00849. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/22/19 denying #8 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #9 Motion to Modify; denying #10 Motion to Expedite; granting #11 Motion to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST by Carlos D Lindsey for Status Update. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Wisconsin by Carlos D Lindsey. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite review of motions by Carlos D Lindsey. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Modify Initial Partial Filing Fee Assessment and/or Waive Fee by Carlos D Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration of #7 Order assessing initial partial filing fee by Carlos D Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 ECF #7 Order, #2 Order-WDWI Case 17-cv-623)(tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/13/19 that the plaintiff is assessed $1.09 as an initial partial payment of the $350.00 fee for filing this case. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, financial, warden)(jad) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Carlos D Lindsey. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Carlos D Lindsey. (lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Carlos D Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Amend Complaint)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Carlos Lindsey re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Carlos D Lindsey. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.] Modified on 11/25/2019 (nln).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Carlos D Lindsey. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 11/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey, Carlos v. Boughton, Gary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebbeus Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boughton
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos D Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?