Khan, Amir v. Lathrop, Logen et al
Plaintiff: Amir Jamel Khan
Defendant: Logen J. Lathrop, Kassandra M. Kimbler and Jeri L. Evans
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2019cv00979
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/22/2020. (jef),(ps)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Amir Jamel Khan. (Attachments: #1 Policy change notification, account statement, information/interview request, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Jeri L. Evans, Logen J. Lathrop, Kassandra M. Kimbler. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 01/13/2020. (rks),(ps)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps)
December 26, 2019 Partial Filing fee received : $7.45, receipt number 34690036026. (rks),(ps)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Amir Jamel Khan assessed an initial partial filing fee of $7.45 due 12/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/2/2019. (nln),(ps)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Amir Jamel Khan. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln).
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Amir Jamel Khan. (nln),(ps)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Amir Jamel Khan. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Under Civil Rights Act 42 U.S.C. 1983) (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan, Amir v. Lathrop, Logen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logen J. Lathrop
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kassandra M. Kimbler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri L. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Jamel Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?