Steinway, Inc. v. Create Music LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steinway, Inc.
Defendant: James Hock, Benjamin Lee Garber and Create Music LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01043
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendants Create Music LLC, Benjamin Lee Garber, James Hock, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jones, Heather)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Haskell for Plaintiff Steinway, Inc. (Haskell, Jessica)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Create Music LLC, Benjamin Lee Garber, and James Hock. (jls)
December 23, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
December 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Steinway, Inc. (Lavey, Laura)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2599059.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 141,687, issued 04/26/1921, held by Steinway, Inc.; Trademark # 45,846, issued 08/29/1905, held by Steinway, Inc.; Trademark # 3,495,327, issued 09/02/2008, held by Steinway, Inc.; Trademark # 607,992, issued 06/28/1955, held by Steinway, Inc.; Trademark # 45,411, issued 08/15/1905, held by Steinway, Inc., filed by Steinway, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Trademark Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Authorized Dealer Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Consignment Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Straight Bill of Lading, #7 Exhibit G - Invoice, #8 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons - Create Music LLC, #10 Summons - Benjamin Lee Garber, #11 Summons - James Hock, #12 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Lavey, Laura) Modified on 12/23/2019: Summonses are incomplete. Deleted addresses of all parties. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinway, Inc. v. Create Music LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hock
Represented By: Heather Bryanna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Lee Garber
Represented By: Heather Bryanna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Create Music LLC
Represented By: Heather Bryanna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steinway, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jean Lavey
Represented By: Jessica Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?