Volkman, Shane v. City Brewing Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Shane Volkman
Defendant: City Brewing Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00112
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Defendant City Brewing Company, LLC as to #6 Answer, #5 Notice of Appearance. (Kirchner, Jessica)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant City Brewing Company, LLC. (Kirchner, Jessica)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Taylor Kirchner for Defendant City Brewing Company, LLC. (Kirchner, Jessica)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant City Brewing Company, LLC. City Brewing Company, LLC waiver sent on 2/7/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Luzi, Scott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City Brewing Company, LLC. (voc)
February 7, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
February 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott Stanton Luzi for Plaintiff Shane Volkman. (Luzi, Scott)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City Brewing Company, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2625021.), filed by Shane Volkman, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volkman, Shane v. City Brewing Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Volkman
Represented By: Scott Stanton Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Brewing Company, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Taylor Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?