Anthony, Marsha v. G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marsha Anthony
Defendant: G & L Enterprises of Hurley LLC, Craig D Lindquist, Alicat Enterprises LLC, Craig D. Lindquist, G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC and Alicat Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00140
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (West, Travis)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIM against Marsha Anthony by Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (West, Travis) Modified on 4/16/2020. (lak)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 Notice by Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist Notice of Substitution of Counsel. (West, Travis)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Edward Johns for Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (Johns, Jason)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Eric Pangburn for Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (Pangburn, Eric)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis James West for Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (West, Travis)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer and for Tolling. Alicat Enterprises, LLC, G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, and Craig D. Lindquist answer due 4/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/13/2020. (kwf)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer and for Tolling by Plaintiff Marsha Anthony. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Johnson, Larry)
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Roisin Heather Bell for Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (Bell, Roisin)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by John Noble Giftos for Defendants G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (Giftos, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. (Johnson, Larry) Modified on 3/5/2020: Indicates Craig Lindquist, G & L Enterprises of Hurley and Allcat Enterprises are designated to accept service on behalf of Iron County Sheriff's Dept. (lak)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Marsha Anthony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form for Opt in Plaintiff Ashlie Patnode, #2 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Marsha Anthony as to #5 Notice (Other). (Johnson, Larry)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Notice by Plaintiff Marsha Anthony Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form for Opt-in Plaintiff Neva Dull) (Johnson, Larry)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Consent to Join Lawsuit by Plaintiff Marsha Anthony Notice of Filing Consent to Join Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent Form of Opt-in Plaintiff Tasha Swanson, #2 Exhibit B: Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Larry)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alicat Enterprises, LLC, G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, Craig D. Lindquist. (kwf)
February 18, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
February 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marsha Anthony. (Johnson, Larry)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2630197.), filed by Marsha Anthony, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form for Marsha Anthony, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC, #4 Summons - Alicat Enterprises, LLC, #5 Summons - Craig D. Lindquist) (Johnson, Larry) Modified on 2/18/2020. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony, Marsha v. G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Anthony
Represented By: Larry A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & L Enterprises of Hurley LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicat Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D. Lindquist
Represented By: Eric Pangburn
Represented By: John Noble Giftos
Represented By: Travis James West
Represented By: Jason Edward Johns
Represented By: Roisin Heather Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & L Enterprises of Hurley, LLC
Represented By: Roisin Heather Bell
Represented By: Eric Pangburn
Represented By: John Noble Giftos
Represented By: Travis James West
Represented By: Jason Edward Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicat Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?