United States of America v. Wethal, Scott, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A., United Cooperative, Zeeland Farm Services, Inc., Deere & Company, Scott K. Wethal and Landmark Services Cooperative
Case Number: 3:2020cv00174
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Scott K. Wethal. Scott K. Wethal waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Oswald, Barbara)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BMO Harris Bank, N.A. and Deere & Company. (jls)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff United States of America. (Oswald, Barbara)
April 10, 2020 Party Zeeland Farm Services, Inc. is terminated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) without further order of the court. (jls)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Oswald, Barbara)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Zeeland Farm Services, Inc.. Zeeland Farm Services, Inc. waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Oswald, Barbara)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Landmark Services Cooperative. Landmark Services Cooperative waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Oswald, Barbara)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant United Cooperative. United Cooperative waiver sent on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Oswald, Barbara)
February 28, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Notice to Creditors, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
February 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 05.08.2009 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - 05.08.2009 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 09.25.2008 Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit D - 02.21.2008 Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit E - 11.01.2012 Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - 10.01.2012 Continuation Statement, #8 Exhibit G - 02.12.2008 Financing Statement, #9 Exhibit H - 10.15.2009 Mortgage, #10 Exhibit I - 07.29.2009 Mortgage, #11 Exhibit J - 09.29.2008 Mortgage, #12 Exhibit K - 02.08.2017 Notice of Acceleration) (Oswald, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wethal, Scott, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeeland Farm Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott K. Wethal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Services Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara L Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?