Butler, Jerry v. Eschalante, Jim et al
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Butler
Defendant: Gail Simpson, Doug Rosenberg, Teri Englke, Jim Eschalante, Beth Janetski and Barb Gerloff
Case Number: 3:2020cv00175
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Teri Englke. Teri Englke waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Jim Eschalante. Jim Eschalante waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Barb Gerloff. Barb Gerloff waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Beth Janetski. Beth Janetski waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Doug Rosenberg. Doug Rosenberg waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Gail Simpson. Gail Simpson waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendants Teri Englke, Jim Eschalante, Barb Gerloff, Beth Janetski, Doug Rosenberg, Gail Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants / Jim Eschalante, et al. Mailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Barb Gerloff, #2 Summons as to Gail Simpson, #3 Summons as to Doug Rosenberg, #4 Summons as to Teri Englke, #5 Summons as to Beth Janetski, #6 Procedure for serving a complaint on individuals in a federal lawsuit, #7 Clerk's office cover letter) (jef),(ps)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from plaintiff clarifying that there is no page 3 to the complaint at dkt. #1 . (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (jef),(ps)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Letter from clerk's office to plaintiff regarding page 3 of the #1 Complaint. (jef),(ps)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34690036460), filed by Jerry E. Butler. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Envelope postmarked 12/2/2019 from Western District of Wisconsin Clerk's Office, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) Clerk's Office note, there was no page 3 submitted. (jef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler, Jerry v. Eschalante, Jim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Simpson
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Rosenberg
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Englke
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Eschalante
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Janetski
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barb Gerloff
Represented By: Rachel Lee Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry E. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?