Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Makita USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company and T-Buck Properties, LLC
Defendant: Makita USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00220
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due 2/1/2021. Settlement Letters due 6/30/2021. Motions in Limine due 7/9/2021. Responses due 7/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/16/2021 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/20/2020. (kwf)
April 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/15/2020 [:07] (cak)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Ayers, Bradley)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Record from St. Croix County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Docket Sheet) (kwf)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The allegations in the amended of notice (dkt. #6 ) are sufficient to establish this court's exercise of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/23/2020. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Document by Defendant Makita USA, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-T-Buck LLC Articles of Incorporation) (Barton, Jonathan)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Jonathan Thomas Barton Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/16/2020. (lak)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Jonathan Thomas Barton Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2645382.) by Defendant Makita USA, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Barton, Jonathan)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Defendant Makita USA, Inc., shall have until March 27, 2020, to file and serve an amended notice of removal containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship for purposes of determining subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/13/2020. (kwf)
March 13, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (kwf)
March 13, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Makita USA, Inc.. (Romero-Boeck, Travis)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of WI Circuit Court - St. Croix County, case number 20-cv-000040. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2643515), filed by Makita USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit C - Defendant Makita USA, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Romero-Boeck, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Insurance Company et al v. Makita USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makita USA, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Delos Jamieson
Represented By: Travis Evan Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J Ayers
Represented By: Nathaniel Richard Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Buck Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?