United States of America v. $78,730.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $78,730.00 United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2020cv00243
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to file verified claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/28/2020. (jls)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to file verified claims by Defendant $78,730.00 United States Currency. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (jls)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (jls)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/23/2020. (jls)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant of Arrest) (Luehring, Heidi)
March 18, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
March 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of David Hall re #1 Complaint (Luehring, Heidi)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $78,730.00 United States Currency., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $78,730.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $78,730.00 United States Currency
Represented By: Eric Lindsay Schulenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?