Democratic National Committee et al v. Bostelmann, Marge et al
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee and Democratic Party of Wisconsin
Defendant: Mark L. Thomsen, Dean Knudson, Ann S. Jacobs, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey and Robert F. Spindell, Jr.
Amicus Curiae: City of Racine, Tony Evers, Dane County, Wisconsin Conservation Voices, City of Green Bay, American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin, City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, Honest Elections Project, Disability Rights Wisconsin, Inc., City of Madison, Wisconsin, Washington County and Wisconsin Counties Association
Intervenor: Wisconsin State Legislature
Intervenor Defendant: Republican National Committee and Republican Party Of Wisconsin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00249
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 201 Brief in Opposition by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: (198 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 133 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 140 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
May 11, 2020 Filing 200 Brief in Opposition by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature re: (198 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 133 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 140 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
May 7, 2020 Filing 199 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: (139 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion to Dismiss filed by Wisconsin State Legislature Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Devaney, John)
May 1, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to (198 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 133 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 140 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Brief in Opposition due 5/11/2020. Brief in Reply due 5/18/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf/nks)
April 30, 2020 Filing 198 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Devaney, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 197 MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Brief in Opposition due 5/7/2020. Brief in Reply due 5/18/2020. (kwf)
April 14, 2020 Filing 196 Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re: (185 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 121 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 128 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Notice of Appeal. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 14, 2020 Filing 195 Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re: (182 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 118 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 125 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Notice of Appeal. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 14, 2020 Filing 194 Transcript Request Form by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re (108 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 115 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 172 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Notice of Appeal,, (128 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 185 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 121 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal,, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 14, 2020 Filing 193 Transcript Request Form by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature re (116 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Notice of Appeal,,,, (125 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Notice of Appeal, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
April 13, 2020 Filing 192 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint in 20 CV 249, DNC et al. v. Bostelmann et al by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **In light of the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals' order, the Wisconsin Legislature has filed a renewed motion to intervene in the proceedings in this case. ('249 dkt. #186.) Although there is some question as to the scope of this court's jurisdiction over that motion pending return of the mandate, the court deems the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals' ruling as law of the case, meaning that the Wisconsin Legislature has effectively been an intervening defendant in all three cases from the time of that decision, and they should be listed as such in each of those cases. Moreover, to the extent properly before this court, that motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/6/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 6, 2020 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/1/2020 via Zoom video conference. [4:00] (Court Reporter JD.) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER from USCA denying stay as to the portions of the district court's order that (1) enjoin the enforcement of the requirement under Wis. Stat. 6.87(6) that absentee ballots must be received by 8:00 p.m. on election day to be counted and extend the deadline for receipt of absentee ballots to 4:00 p.m. on April 13, 2020; and (2) enjoin the enforcement of the requirement under Wis. Stat. 6.86(1)(b) that absentee ballot requests must be received by April 2, 2020, and extend the deadline for receipt of absentee ballot requests by mail, fax or email (and if deemed administratively feasible in the sole discretion of the WEC Administrator, online) to 5:00 p.m. on April 3, 2020; granting stay as to that portion of the district court's order that enjoins the enforcement of Wis. Stat. 6.87(2) for absentee voters who provide a written affirmation or other statement that they were unable to safely obtain a witness certification despite reasonable efforts to do so; concluding that the Wisconsin State Legislature has standing to pursue this appeal, and that the district court erred in refusing to permit the Legislature to intervene in the case re: (108 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 115 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 172 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, (116 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 173 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 109 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Wisconsin State Legislature, (125 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 182 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 118 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Wisconsin State Legislature, (128 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 185 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 121 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 6, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-1546 for (128 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 185 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 121 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 6, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-1545 for (182 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 125 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 118 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 6, 2020 Filing 188 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: (128 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 185 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 121 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order No.: 179, #2 Order No.: 180, #3 Docket Sheet) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 6, 2020 Filing 187 Appeal Information Packet. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 5, 2020 Filing 186 Motion to Intervene Renewed Motions & Request for Immediate Relief by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Response due 4/13/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
April 3, 2020 Filing 185 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin as to (180 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 123 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 116 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Order, (122 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 179 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 115 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Order on Motion for Clarification,. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2656651 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 3, 2020 Filing 184 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Amended Preliminary Injunction Order and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: (125 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 182 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 118 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Amended Preliminary Injunction Order, #3 Docket Sheet) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 183 Appeal Information Packet. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature as to (180 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 123 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 116 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Order. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2656636 paid. Docketing Statement filed. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Amended Preliminary Injunction Order) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
April 3, 2020 Filing 181 Transcript of Video Conference Evidentiary Hearing, held 4/1/2020 before District Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER for amended preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 04/03/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (mfh)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting (174) Motion for Clarification. in case 3:20-cv-00249-wmc; granting (117) Motion for Clarification. in case 3:20-cv-00284-wmc Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 04/03/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (mfh)
April 3, 2020 Filing 178 Notice by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re (110 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 174 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 117 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Notice (Other),, Response to Defendants' Motion for Clarification. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 3, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-1539 for (116 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 173 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 109 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 3, 2020 USCA Case Number 20-1538 for (108 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 115 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 172 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 3, 2020 Filing 177 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Orders and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re (116 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 173 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 109 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Order No.: 85, #3 Order No.: 163, #4 Opinion and Order, #5 Preliminary Injunction Order, #6 Docket Sheet) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 176 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Opinion and Order, Preliminary Injunction Order and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: (108 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 115 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 172 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Preliminary Injunction Order, #3 Docket Sheet) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 3, 2020 Filing 175 Appeal Information Packet. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
April 2, 2020 Filing 174 Motion for Clarification by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re (170 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel) Modified on 4/3/2020. (lak)
April 2, 2020 Filing 173 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Intervenor Parties Wisconsin State Legislature, Wisconsin State Legislature, Wisconsin State Legislature as to (113 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 170 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 106 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (99 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 106 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 163 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Order on Motion to Intervene, (85 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Order on Motion to Intervene, (171 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 114 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 107 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Preliminary Injunction,,,,,. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2655933 paid. Docketing Statement filed. (Attachments: #1 Docketing Statement, #2 Exhibit Opinion and Order Denying Intervention, #3 Exhibit Opinion and Order Denying Renewed Intervention and Intervention, #4 Exhibit Opinion and Order Granting in Part Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit Preliminary Injunction Order) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
April 2, 2020 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin as to (113 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 170 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 106 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (171 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 114 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 107 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Preliminary Injunction,,,,,. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 26OINN7B paid. No Docketing Statement filed. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. IT IS ORDERED that defendants the Commissioners of the Wisconsin Election Commission and its Administrator are ENJOINED as follows: a) Defendants are enjoined from enforcing the requirement under Wis. Stat. 6.87(6) that absentee ballots must be received by 8:00 p.m. on election day to be counted. The deadline for receipt of absentee ballots is extended to 4:00 p.m. on April 13, 2020.b) Defendants are enjoined from enforcing the requirement under Wis. Stat. 6.86(1)(b) that absentee ballot requests must be received by April 2, 2020. The deadline for receipt of absentee ballot requests by mail, fax or email (and if deemed administratively feasible in the sole discretion of the WEC Administrator, online) is extended to 5:00 p.m. on April 3, 2020.c) Defendants are enjoined from enforcing Wis. Stat. 6.87(2) as to absentee voters who have provided a written affirmation or other statement that they were unable to safely obtain a witness certification despite reasonable efforts to do so, provided that the ballots are otherwise valid.Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/2/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (61) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 3:20-cv-00249-wmc Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 04/02/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (mfh)
April 1, 2020 Notice to Counsel: Attorneys in a non-speaking role, members of the press, and the public may listen to today's evidentiary hearing by dialing 888-273-3658, entering access code 2731593, and then entering security code 1122. Please Note: This is an audio feed only. Video is not available except to lead counsel for the parties. Callers MUST mute their phones. The press and the public are allowed to observe. There will be no opportunity to participate or ask questions. (arw)
April 1, 2020 Filing 169 Exhibit List For April 1, 2020 Hearing by Plaintiffs American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO, Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Greg Lewis, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, Souls to the Polls, Voces De La Frontera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lewis Plaintiffs Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit Lewis Plaintiffs Exhibit 102, #3 Exhibit Lewis Plaintiffs Exhibit 103) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Hollander, David)
April 1, 2020 Filing 168 Exhibit List Witness List and Counsel Designation for April 1, 2020 Hearing by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gahnz, Dixon)
April 1, 2020 Filing 167 Notice by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re (87 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 144 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 80 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Order Statement re: Counsel, Witnesses, Exhibits. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Filing 166 Exhibit List Witness List, and Counsel Designation for April 1, 2020 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (RE-FILED ON 20-cv-249 DOCKET) by Plaintiffs Sylvia Gear, Patricia Ginter, Malekeh K. Hakami, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Claire Whelan, Wisconsin Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 51 - WEC March 29, 2020 Memorandum on Witness Requirement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 52 - WEC Form EL 122 - Absentee Ballot Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 53 - Emergency Order #12, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 54 - US Census Table 2501, American Community Survey, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 55 - CDC Webpage: How Coronavirus Spreads) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Sherman, Jonathan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 165 Exhibit List Witness List, and Counsel Designation for April 1, 2020 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Sylvia Gear, Patricia Ginter, Malekeh K. Hakami, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Claire Whelan, Wisconsin Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 51 - WEC March 29, 2020 Memorandum on Witness Requirement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 52 - WEC Form EL 122 - Absentee Ballot Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 53 - Emergency Order #12, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 54 - US Census Table 2501, American Community Survey, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 55 - CDC Webpage: How Coronavirus Spreads) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Sherman, Jonathan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 164 Notice by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin of Counsel, Witnesses and Exhibits. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Spiva, Bruce)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER denying (118, 137) renewed motions to intervene but granting motion to file amicus brief. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/1/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (bgw)
March 31, 2020 Filing 162 Supplemental Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO, Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Greg Lewis, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, Souls to the Polls, Voces De La Frontera in Support of (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Hollander, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 161 Motion to Supplement Brief Addressing Remedies by Plaintiffs American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO, Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Greg Lewis, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, Souls to the Polls, Voces De La Frontera. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Hollander, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 160 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs Sylvia Gear, Patricia Ginter, Malekeh K. Hakami, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Claire Whelan, Wisconsin Alliance for Retired Americans in Support of (8 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for TRO, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Complaint in Florida Democratic Party v. Scott (N.D. Fla. 2016), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Complaint in Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. v. Deal (S.D. Ga. 2016)) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Sherman, Jonathan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 159 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (8 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gahnz, Dixon)
March 31, 2020 Filing 158 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gahnz, Dixon)
March 31, 2020 Filing 157 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gahnz, Dixon)
March 31, 2020 Filing 156 Third Declaration of Meagan Wolfe filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gahnz, Dixon)
March 31, 2020 Filing 155 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, filed by Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, Souls to the Polls, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Voces De La Frontera, Greg Lewis, American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gahnz, Dixon)
March 31, 2020 Filing 154 Brief in Support of (96 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on the By-Mail Absentee Deadline and Documentation Requirements by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Spiva, Bruce)
March 31, 2020 Filing 153 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on the By-Mail Absentee Deadline and Documentation Requirements by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Spiva, Bruce)
March 31, 2020 Filing 152 Notice by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen regarding absentee ballot counting. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 151 Brief in Support of (125 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 61 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Tony Evers Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc (Jurss, Hannah)
March 31, 2020 Filing 150 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by David Gault Amicus Parties Dane County, Dane County, Dane County (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Motion of County of Dane for Leave to file Amicus, #3 Exhibit A - Poll Worker Shortage, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Scott McDonnell, #5 Exhibit C - Memo from PHMDC dated 03-31-2020, #6 Declaration of Scott McDonnell) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Gault, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 149 Brief in Support of (148 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 91 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 84 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for Leave to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 148 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 147 Brief in Support of (59 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 54 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 118 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion to Intervene Renewed Motion in DNC & Motion in Gear by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 146 Declaration of Misha Tseytlin filed by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature re: (85 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Absentee Ballot Report - April 7, 2020 Spring Election, #2 Exhibit Wisconsin Democracy Campaign Press Release, #3 Exhibit Open Secrets, WI Party Transfers 2020 Cycle, #4 Exhibit Schmidt Article, #5 Exhibit Kenneally Article, #6 Exhibit WEC List of Candidates on Ballot by Election, #7 Exhibit List of Wisconsin Counties, #8 Exhibit Wisconsin Supreme Court Order Mar. 31, 2020, #9 Exhibit Emilee Fannon Twitter Post) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 145 Proposed Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER on April 1, 2020, video hearing. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/31/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (bgw)
March 31, 2020 Filing 143 Brief in Support of (85 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 142 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 78 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for Leave to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss or as Amicus Curiae by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 142 Motion for Leave to File Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 141 Brief in Support of (137 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 73 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 80 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion to Intervene or for Leave to File an Amicus Brief by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 140 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 139 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: (8 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 138 Brief in Opposition by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin, Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: (8 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for TRO, filed by Claire Whelan, Malekeh K. Hakami, Sylvia Gear, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Patricia Ginter, Wisconsin Alliance for Retired Americans, (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, filed by Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, Souls to the Polls, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Voces De La Frontera, Greg Lewis, American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 137 Motion to Intervene or for Leave to File an Amicus Brief by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Response due 4/7/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 136 Witness List DISCLOSURE OF DECLARATIONS THAT ARE DIRECT EVIDENCE FOR APRIL 1, 2020 HEARING by Plaintiffs American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO, Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Greg Lewis, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, Souls to the Polls, Voces De La Frontera Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Hollander, David)
March 31, 2020 Filing 135 Declaration of Neil Albrecht filed by Plaintiffs Sylvia Gear, Patricia Ginter, Malekeh K. Hakami, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Claire Whelan, Wisconsin Alliance for Retired Americans re: (8 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for TRO, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Sherman, Jonathan)
March 31, 2020 Set Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/1/2020 at 1:00 PM before District Judge William M. Conley via Zoom Video Conference. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
March 31, 2020 Filing 134 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amicus Parties Washington County, Wisconsin Counties Association. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Phillips, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 Filing 133 Brief in Opposition by Amicus Parties Washington County, Wisconsin Counties Association re: (17 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for TRO, filed by Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, Souls to the Polls, SEIU Wisconsin State Council, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Voces De La Frontera, Greg Lewis, American Federation of Teachers Local, 212, AFL-CIO (Attachments: #1 Appendix of County Ordinances) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Phillips, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 Filing 132 Brief in Support of (129 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 65 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 71 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Parties City of Racine, City of Racine, City of Racine (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bowersox, #2 Declaration of Coolidge, #3 Declaration of Mason) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tran, Nhu)
March 31, 2020 Filing 131 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and Alternative Motion to Intervene by Amicus Parties Washington County, Wisconsin Counties Association. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Phillips, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 Filing 130 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re (96 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 37 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 32 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Brief in Opposition, . Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Filing 129 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Parties City of Racine, City of Racine, City of Racine. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tran, Nhu)
March 31, 2020 Filing 128 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Thomas Phillips for Amicus Parties Washington County, Wisconsin Counties Association. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Phillips, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 Filing 127 Notice of Appearance filed by William E. Fischer for Amicus Parties Washington County, Wisconsin Counties Association. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Fischer, William)
March 31, 2020 Filing 126 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Jeffrey Thome for Amicus Parties Washington County, Washington County, Washington County, Wisconsin Counties Association, Wisconsin Counties Association, Wisconsin Counties Association. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Thome, Matthew)
March 31, 2020 Filing 125 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Case Number 20-cv-284-wmc by Amicus Party Tony Evers. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc (Jurss, Hannah) Modified on 3/31/2020. (arw)
March 31, 2020 Filing 124 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Nhu Huong Tran Amicus Parties City of Racine, City of Racine, City of Racine Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tran, Nhu)
March 31, 2020 Filing 123 Notice by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen regarding absentee ballot counting. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court previously granted the Republican National Committee and the Republican Party of Wisconsin's motion to intervene in Case No. 20-cv-249. After granting that motion, the court consolidated the '249 case with Case Nos. 20-cv-278 and 20-cv-284. Now, in the '278 and '284 cases, the RNC and Republican Party of Wisconsin have moved to intervene in an effort to clarify their status in these two cases. ('278 dkt. #22 ; '284 dkt. #27 .) Those motions are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/31/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (kwf)
March 31, 2020 Filing 121 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs in Lewis v. Knudsen by Amicus Parties American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin, American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin, Disability Rights Wisconsin, Inc., Wisconsin Conservation Voices. (Attachments: #1 Br. of Amici Curiae Disability Rights Wis., ACLU of Wis., and Wis. Conservation Voices, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Rotker, Karyn)
March 31, 2020 Filing 120 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Karyn L. Rotker Amicus Parties Disability Rights Wisconsin, Inc., Disability Rights Wisconsin, Inc., Disability Rights Wisconsin, Inc., American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin, American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin, American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin, Wisconsin Conservation Voices, Wisconsin Conservation Voices, Wisconsin Conservation Voices Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Rotker, Karyn)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (117) Motion to Admit John Devaney Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/31/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc. (lak)
March 31, 2020 Filing 118 Motion to Intervene Renewed Motion In DNC & Motion In Gear by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Response due 4/7/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 31, 2020 Filing 117 Motion to Admit John Devaney Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2654181.) by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Devaney, John)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court will hold a videoconference at 3:30 p.m., today, March 31, 2020, using Zoom to both test the platform and discuss setting an evidentiary hearing for tomorrow afternoon, April 1, 2020. The court will send an invite via email to all counsel of record for the parties listed on the dockets for the three election-related cases. All counsel, however, need not attend this conference; rather, it is most important that LEAD counsel who will participate in tomorrow's hearing participate in this videoconference. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/31/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (mfh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 115 Notice by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen Not Opposing Motions for Leave to File from Amici Curiae. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 114 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re (96 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 37 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 32 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Brief in Opposition, . Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 113 Affidavit of Kris Teske filed by Amicus Parties City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay re: (111 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 52 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 47 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for Leave to File Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Chavez, Vanessa)
March 30, 2020 Filing 112 Brief in Support of (111 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 52 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 47 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus Parties City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Chavez, Vanessa)
March 30, 2020 Filing 111 Motion for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus Parties City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Chavez, Vanessa)
March 30, 2020 Filing 110 Notice of Appearance filed by Vanessa Chavez for Amicus Parties City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay, City of Green Bay. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Chavez, Vanessa)
March 30, 2020 Filing 109 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 108 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 107 Brief in Reply by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen in Support of (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 106 Declaration of Meagan Wolfe filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe, Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Uniform Instructions for Wisconsin Absentee Voters, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Governor Tony Evers, #3 Exhibit C - Notice: COVID-19 Supplies and Spending Authority, #4 Exhibit D - Notice: Absentee Witness Signature Requirement, #5 Exhibit E - Election Day Checklist for Polling Places, #6 Exhibit F - Poll Worker Procedures for April 7, 2020) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Lenz, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 105 Supplemental Declaration of Cecilia Aguilera filed by Plaintiffs Sylvia Gear, Patricia Ginter, Malekeh K. Hakami, League of Women Voters of Wisconsin, Claire Whelan, Wisconsin Alliance for Retired Americans re: (8 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc) Motion for TRO, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit W - WEC Memorandum "Absentee Witness Signature Requirement Guidance" (Mar. 29, 2020)) Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Sherman, Jonathan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 104 Response re: (22 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Order,, Responsive Brief on Behalf of Amicus Curiae City of Madison by Amicus City of Madison, Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (May, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 103 Notice of Appearance by Steven C. Brist filed by Michael P. May for Amicus City of Madison, Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (May, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 102 Notice of Appearance by Michael P. May filed by Michael P. May for Amicus City of Madison, Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (May, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 101 Declaration of Neil Albrecht IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF MILWAUKEE'S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Stephens, Adam)
March 30, 2020 Filing 100 Brief in Support of (39 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Stephens, Adam)
March 30, 2020 Filing 99 Brief in Support of (39 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Leave to File by Amicus City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Stephens, Adam)
March 30, 2020 Filing 98 Motion for Leave to File THE CITY OF MILWAUKEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Stephens, Adam)
March 30, 2020 Filing 97 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 96 Brief in Opposition by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 30, 2020 Filing 95 Brief in Opposition by Amicus Honest Elections Project re: (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Torchinsky, Jason)
March 30, 2020 Filing 94 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Honest Elections Project. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Torchinsky, Jason)
March 30, 2020 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance filed by Jason Brett Torchinsky for Amicus Parties Honest Elections Project, Honest Elections Project, Honest Elections Project. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Torchinsky, Jason)
March 30, 2020 Filing 92 Notice of Appearance filed by Amy Miller for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc (Miller, Amy)
March 30, 2020 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Joseph Walsh for Intervenor Parties Wisconsin State Legislature, Wisconsin State Legislature, Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc (Walsh, Ryan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 90 Brief in Opposition by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature re: (89 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 25 in 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 30 in 3:20-cv-00284-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by Wisconsin State Legislature, (61 in 3:20-cv-00249-wmc) Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 30, 2020 Filing 89 Motion for Motion of Wisconsin Legislature for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae Combined Amicus Brief in Opposition to the Democratic Party Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on the By-Mail Absentee Deadline and Documentation Requirements, and the Gear Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Response due 4/6/2020. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 30, 2020 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott Allen Keller for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00278-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00284-wmc (Keller, Scott)
March 30, 2020 Filing 87 Notice of Appearance filed by Terrence M. Polich for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, Meagan Wolfe. Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-00284-wmc, 3:20-cv-00249-wmc, 3:20-cv-00278-wmc (Polich, Terrence)
March 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER consolidating case nos. 20-cv-249, 20-cv-278 and 20-cv-284. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/28/2020. (bgw)
March 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying #20 Wisconsin Legislature's Motion to Intervene, granting #41 Republican National Committee and the Republican Party of Wisconsin's motion to intervene, and granting [ #56 , #57 , #58 ] motions to withdraw as counsel. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/28/2020.(bgw)
March 28, 2020 Filing 84 Notice by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re #81 Notice (Other) Stating No Opposition to Consolidation. (Lenz, Daniel)
March 28, 2020 Filing 83 Notice by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re #82 Notice (Other), #81 Notice (Other) Letter re: Consolidation & Defendants' Changed Position on Intervention. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 28, 2020 Filing 82 Notice by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re #51 Brief in Opposition, Withdrawing Objections to Intervention. (Lenz, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 81 Notice by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature Letter regarding request for consolidation. (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and reconsideration of the court's ruling on the by-mail absentee deadline. (Dkt. #61 .) Defendants may have until Monday, March 30, 2020, to file their response, including a response to plaintiffs' proposed findings of facts (dkt. #61 -2). That same deadline applies for any friend of the court briefs, whether in support of or in opposition to the motion. The court will set an expedited hearing on the motion after receipt of those briefs as necessary. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/27/2020. (kwf)
March 27, 2020 Filing 79 Proposed ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 78 Brief in Reply by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin in Support of #41 Motion to Intervene (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 77 Declaration of Maribeth Witzel-Behl filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 76 Declaration of Dean Strang filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 75 Declaration of Ben Wilson filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 74 Declaration of Scott McDonell filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 73 Declaration of Neil Albrecht filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 72 Declaration of Judith Morse filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 71 Brief in Reply by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature in Support of #20 Motion to Intervene (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 27, 2020 Filing 70 Declaration of Jeff Trapp filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 69 Declaration of Peggy Roush filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 68 Declaration of Martha Love filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 67 Declaration of Betheny Larson filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 66 Declaration of John Keel filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 65 Declaration of Becky Eggen filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 64 Declaration of Molly Callahan filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 63 Declaration of Bruce V. Spiva filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2020-03-26 B. Burden Expert Rpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Outbreaks in Wisconsin _ Wisconsin Department of Health Services, #3 Exhibit 3 - Democratic National Committee v Bostelmann Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 - Health Order #12 Safer At Home, #5 Exhibit 5 - Article published by CNN, #6 Exhibit 6 - Evers No plan to move April 7 election date; urges absentee voting, #7 Exhibit 7 - Officials urge absentee voting as Wisco...ll on Local government madison, #8 Exhibit 8 - Milwaukee officials worry about spread of coronavirus during April's election, #9 Exhibit 9 - Governor-EversSenator-Scott-FitzgeraldRepresentative-Robin-Vos-3.23.20, #10 Exhibit 10 - Voters Encouraged to Vote Absentee for April 7 Election - OnFocus, #11 Exhibit 11 - Oshkosh+Voting+Flyer, #12 Exhibit 12 - March 16 2020 Press Release, #13 Exhibit 13 - Absentee Ballot Report - April 7, 2020.., #14 Exhibit 14 - 914 AM March 23, 2020 tweet from Madison WI Clerk, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2018-10-23 WEC Facebook, #16 Exhibit 16 - Voting by mail in the April 7 Wisconsin election, explained Local government, #17 Exhibit 17 - Emergency Guidance - Remote Notarization) (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 62 Brief in Support of #61 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Facts) (Spiva, Bruce)
March 27, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and Reconsideration of the Court's Ruling on the By-Mail Absentee Deadline and Documentation Requirements by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Spiva, Bruce)
March 26, 2020 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel P. Bach for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Bach, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 59 Notice of Appearance filed by Zachary Newkirk for Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Newkirk, Zachary)
March 26, 2020 Filing 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney S. Michael Murphy by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Response due 4/2/2020. (Murphy, Sean)
March 26, 2020 Filing 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Response due 4/2/2020. (Schmelzer, Jody)
March 26, 2020 Filing 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Brian P. Keenan by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. Response due 4/2/2020. (Keenan, Brian)
March 26, 2020 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen, filed by Democratic Party of Wisconsin, Democratic National Committee. (Spiva, Bruce)
March 26, 2020 Filing 54 Declaration of Bruce V. Spiva filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin in Support of Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition re: #41 Motion to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2020-03-20 RNC Email Requesting Consent, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2020-3-23-Governor-Evers-Senator-Scott, #3 Exhibit 3 - Evers Safer at Home Schedule, #4 Exhibit 4 - Outbreaks in Wisconsin _ Wisconsin Department of Health Services) (Spiva, Bruce)
March 26, 2020 Filing 53 Disregard. Modified on 3/26/2020. (lak)
March 26, 2020 Filing 52 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #41 Motion to Intervene filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin (Spiva, Bruce)
March 26, 2020 Filing 51 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: #20 Motion to Intervene filed by Wisconsin State Legislature, #41 Motion to Intervene filed by Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin (Lenz, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Spector Lenz for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Lenz, Daniel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance filed by Terrence M. Polich for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Polich, Terrence)
March 25, 2020 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance /Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel filed by Dixon R. Gahnz for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Gahnz, Dixon)
March 25, 2020 Filing 47 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference, held 3/19/2020 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. (voc)
March 25, 2020 Filing 46 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference, held 3/23/2020 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. (voc)
March 24, 2020 Filing 45 Notice by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin of Response to Motion in Support Of Leave To File Amicus Memo By the Cities Of Milwaukee And Madison. (Spiva, Bruce)
March 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2020 [:55] (Court Reporter JD.) (mfh)
March 23, 2020 Filing 44 Notice by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin of Proposed Edits to Court's Special Notice. (Spiva, Bruce)
March 23, 2020 Filing 43 Response re: #37 Order on Motion for TRO by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Memo from WEC) (Keenan, Brian)
March 22, 2020 Filing 42 Brief in Support of #41 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 22, 2020 Filing 41 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. Response due 3/30/2020. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 40 Affidavit of Neil Albrecht filed by Amicus City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin re: #39 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Memorandum by the Cities of Milwaukee and Madison, Wisconsin. (jls)
March 20, 2020 Filing 39 Motion in Support of Leave to File Amicus Memorandum by the Cities of Milwaukee and Madison, Wisconsin. (jls)
March 20, 2020 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Adam Boyd Stephens for Amicus City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin. (jls)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for TRO and preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 03/20/2020. (mfh)
March 20, 2020 Filing 36 Notice by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin of Opposition to Forthcoming Motion to Intervene by Republican National Committee and Republican Party of Wisconsin. (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Strawbridge for Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. (Strawbridge, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 34 Notice by Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin re: Forthcoming Motion to Intervene. (Harris, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Matthew Harris for Intervenor Defendants Republican National Committee, Republican Party Of Wisconsin. (Harris, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 32 Supplemental Declaration of Bruce V. Spiva filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #2 Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Politico Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tampa Bay Times Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Palm Beach Post Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tampa Bay Times Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - Buzzfeed News Article, #6 Exhibit 6 - Chicago Tribune Article, #7 Exhibit 7 - Arizona Republic Article) (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of Katie Dickey filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #2 Motion for TRO (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Douglas Koop filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #2 Motion for TRO (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Amia Bridgeford filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #2 Motion for TRO (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 28 Declaration of Hannah Temes filed by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #2 Motion for TRO (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 27 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin re: #20 Motion to Intervene filed by Wisconsin State Legislature (Spiva, Bruce)
March 20, 2020 Filing 26 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: #2 Motion for TRO filed by Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin (Keenan, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Misha Tseytlin filed by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature re: #22 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CDC Guidance, #2 Exhibit Illinois Election Press Release, #3 Exhibit Cook County, IL Election Summary, #4 Exhibit Arizona Election Results, #5 Exhibit Florida Election Results, #6 Exhibit WisPolitics 19 March 2020 Update, #7 Exhibit WEC - Special Teleconference Meeting COVID-19, #8 Exhibit Ohio Order To Close Polling Locations, #9 Exhibit Administrator Wolfe Memo - COVID-19 Election Planning, #10 Exhibit The UPS Store - Note to Customers, #11 Exhibit WEC - Proof of Residence Information, #12 Exhibit WEC - Vote Absentee, #13 Exhibit Pew Research Center - Mobile Fact Sheet, #14 Exhibit WEC Absentee Voting COVID-19 Press Release) (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 20, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of Meagan Wolfe filed by Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen re: #2 Motion for TRO (Keenan, Brian)
March 20, 2020 Filing 23 Brief in Support of #22 Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 20, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed MOTION TO DISMISS by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. (Tseytlin, Misha) Modified on 3/20/2020. (kwf)
March 20, 2020 Filing 21 Brief in Support of #20 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 20, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. Response due 3/27/2020. (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 19, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/19/2020 [1:10] (Court Reporter CS.) (mfh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael LeRoy for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. (LeRoy, Kevin)
March 19, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa M. Lawless for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. (Lawless, Lisa)
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Lane Ruhland filed by Lane E Ruhland for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. (Ruhland, Lane)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance of Eric M McLeod filed by Eric M. McLeod for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. (McLeod, Eric)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Jody J. Schmelzer for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Schmelzer, Jody)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Sean Michael Murphy for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Murphy, Sean)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian P. Keenan for Defendants Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (Keenan, Brian)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance Sopen B. Shah filed by Sopen Bharat Shah for Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Shah, Sopen)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance Charles G. Curtis, Jr. filed by Charles Grant Curtis, Jr for Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Curtis, Charles)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Consistent with request of the parties and proposed intervenor the court will hold a telephone conference call at 3 pm today, plaintiff to initiate the call to the court at 608-264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/19/2020. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Marc Erik Elias for Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Elias, Marc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 Notice by Prospective Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature Letter regarding Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Proposed Motion to Intervene, and Proposed Motion to Dismiss . (Tseytlin, Misha) Modified on 3/19/2020. (arw)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Misha Tseytlin for Intervenor Wisconsin State Legislature. (Tseytlin, Misha)
March 19, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley. Case no longer assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **This case was non-randomly assigned to District Judge James Peterson based on plaintiffs' representation that the case is related to One Wisconsin Institute, Inc. v. Nichol, No. 15-cv-324-jdp. A review of the complaint shows that the two cases are not related to each other, so the clerk of court is directed to randomly assign the case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/19/2020. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 19, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. See related case 15-cv-324-jdp. (kwf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda Callais for Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Callais, Amanda)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Brief in Support of #2 Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party Of Wisconsin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bruce V. Spiva, #2 Exhibit 1 - DHS Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Absentee Ballot Requests, #4 Exhibit 3 - Madison Public Library Closing, #5 Exhibit 4 - Number of WI COVID-19 cases, #6 Exhibit 5 - WEC Gen. Elec. Statistics, #7 Exhibit 6 - Wall St Journal Article) (Spiva, Bruce)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Democratic National Committee, Democratic Party of Wisconsin. (Spiva, Bruce)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marge Bostelmann, Julie M. Glancey, Ann S. Jacobs, Dean Knudson, Robert F. Spindell, Jr, Mark L. Thomsen. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2647332.), filed by Democratic Party of Wisconsin, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Marge Bostelmann, #3 Summons for Julie Glancey, #4 Summons for Ann Jacobs, #5 Summons for Dean Knudson, #6 Summons for Robert Spindell, #7 Summons for Mark Thomsen) (Spiva, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Democratic National Committee et al v. Bostelmann, Marge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Charles Grant Curtis, Jr.
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Represented By: John Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Zachary Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Party of Wisconsin
Represented By: Amanda Callais
Represented By: Bruce Van Spiva
Represented By: Charles Grant Curtis, Jr.
Represented By: Sopen Bharat Shah
Represented By: John Devaney
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Zachary Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Thomsen
Represented By: Daniel Spector Lenz
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Represented By: Terrence M. Polich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Knudson
Represented By: Daniel Spector Lenz
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Represented By: Terrence M. Polich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann S. Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel Spector Lenz
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Represented By: Terrence M. Polich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marge Bostelmann
Represented By: Daniel Spector Lenz
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Represented By: Terrence M. Polich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie M. Glancey
Represented By: Daniel Spector Lenz
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Represented By: Terrence M. Polich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F. Spindell, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Spector Lenz
Represented By: Sean Michael Murphy
Represented By: Dixon R. Gahnz
Represented By: Daniel P. Bach
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Represented By: Terrence M. Polich
Represented By: Brian P. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Racine
Represented By: Arn Huong Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tony Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dane County
Represented By: David Gault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wisconsin Conservation Voices
Represented By: Karyn L. Rotker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Green Bay
Represented By: Vanessa Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union Of Wisconsin
Represented By: Karyn L. Rotker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City Of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Represented By: Adam Boyd Stephens
Represented By: Grant F. Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Honest Elections Project
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Wisconsin, Inc.
Represented By: Karyn L. Rotker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Madison, Wisconsin
Represented By: Michael P. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington County
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Thome
Represented By: William E. Fischer
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wisconsin Counties Association
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Thome
Represented By: William E. Fischer
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Wisconsin State Legislature
Represented By: Amy Miller
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Kevin Michael LeRoy
Represented By: Eric M. McLeod
Represented By: Lane E Ruhland
Represented By: Lisa M. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican Party Of Wisconsin
Represented By: Patrick Strawbridge
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?