Roberts, William v. Gallagher, Lee et al
Plaintiff: William Russell Roberts
Defendant: Enterprise Rental Company, Northern Arizona Healthcare, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Lee Anne Gallagher, Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and MAPFRE Insurance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00299
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the above entitled action is dismissed without prejudice as to defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., subject to its reopening and tolling of any applicable statutes of limitations if all issues have not been fully addressed upon the completion of bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/3/2020. (rks),(ps)
May 27, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Hertz Corporation Voluntary Petition for Bankruptcy) (Elger, Daniel),(ps)
May 27, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy Court Letter 5-27-20 by Defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Elger, Daniel),(ps)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Brief(s) in Opposition due 6/12/2020. Defendants' Brief(s) in Reply due 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/26/2020. (nln),(ps)
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff William Russell Roberts. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Roberts, William),(ps)
May 13, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Kathleen Kimberly Curtis for Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare. (Curtis, Kathleen),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Stacy Kay Luell for Defendant Enterprise Rental Company. (Luell, Stacy),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Filing 21 Brief in Support of #20 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Enterprise Rental Company (Castro, Jose),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Enterprise Rental Company. (Castro, Jose),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Jose Antonio Castro for Defendant Enterprise Rental Company. (Castro, Jose),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Daniel S. Elger filed by Defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. re: #17 Motion to Dismiss, #16 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint) (Elger, Daniel),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Filing 17 Brief in Support of #16 MOTION TO DISMISS, by Defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. (Elger, Daniel),(ps) Modified on 5/12/2020 (nln).
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Elger, Daniel),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 6/2/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/12/2020. (nln),(ps)
May 12, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 6/2/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/12/2020. (nln),(ps)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS and Alternative Answer by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Farb, Peter),(ps)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel S. Elger for Defendant Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Elger, Daniel),(ps)
May 11, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS and Alternative Answer. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 6/1/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/11/2020. (nln),(ps)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 Declaration of Colleen E. Maring filed by Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare re: #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Haws, Daniel),(ps)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 Brief in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Haws, Daniel),(ps)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare. (Haws, Daniel),(ps)
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare. (Haws, Daniel),(ps)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Allen Haws for Defendant Northern Arizona Healthcare. (Haws, Daniel),(ps)
May 8, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 5/29/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/8/2020. (nln),(ps)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Gregory Kosnoski filed by Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Gustafson, Erik),(ps)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Lee Anne Gallagher filed by Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance re: #4 Motion to Dismiss (Gustafson, Erik),(ps)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 Brief in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance (Gustafson, Erik),(ps)
May 4, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS . Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 5/26/2020. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 6/5/2020. (nln),(ps)
May 3, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrea Pearson Goode for Defendants Lee Anne Gallagher, MAPFRE Insurance. (Goode, Andrea),(ps)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant MAPFRE Insurance. (Gustafson, Erik),(ps)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Erik Matthew Gustafson for Defendant MAPFRE Insurance. (Gustafson, Erik),(ps)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to MAPFRE Insurance, #2 Summons as to MAPFRE Insurance, #3 Summons as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., #4 Summons as to Liberty Mutual Insurance, #5 Summons as to Hertz Corporat Headquarters, #6 Summons as to Hertz Global Holdings, Inc., #7 Summons as to EAN Holdings dba Enterprise Rental Company, #8 Summons as to Enterprise Holdings, #9 Summons as to Northern Arizona Healthcare) (jef),(ps)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34690036702), filed by William Russell Roberts. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Crash report, vehicle removal report, correspondence, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses, #4 Cover Letter) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts, William v. Gallagher, Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rental Company
Represented By: Jose Antonio Castro
Represented By: Stacy Kay Luell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Arizona Healthcare
Represented By: Daniel Allen Haws
Represented By: Kathleen Kimberly Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Represented By: Peter M. Farb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Anne Gallagher
Represented By: Andrea Pearson Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S. Elger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPFRE Insurance
Represented By: Andrea Pearson Goode
Represented By: Erik Matthew Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Russell Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?