Armagost v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kendall Armagost
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv00307
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Kendall Armagost. (Bowden, Wesley)
May 21, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #17 Motion to Admit Wesley A. Bowden Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/13/2020. (lak)
May 12, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to Admit Wesley A Bowden Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2676862.) by Plaintiff Kendall Armagost. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standings) (Bowden, Wesley)
May 11, 2020 Notice to Counsel: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2020 is canceled as unnecessary. (arw/slc)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Preliminary Scheduling Order: Dispositive Motions due 10/15/2021. Settlement Letters due 3/25/2022. Motions in Limine due 3/25/2022. Response to Motion due 4/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/16/2022 at 09:00 AM. # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/7/2020. (jls)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Motion to Set Trial Date by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Response due 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LaRoche motion to transfer) (Helm, Catherine)
April 19, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Kendall Armagost. (Knurr, Timothy)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Helm, Catherine)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Knurr for Plaintiff Kendall Armagost. (Knurr, Timothy)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Elizabeth C. Helm Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/10/2020. (lak)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to Admit Catherine Helm Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2659399.) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Helm, Catherine)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis Evan Romero-Boeck for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Romero-Boeck, Travis)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine A. Faught for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Faught, Catherine)
April 3, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiffs responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw/slc)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The MDL court in Arizona has remanded six more IVC cases to this court. Counsel for the parties are to meet and confer to fashion a set of schedules that meets the court's criteria, set forth later in this order. The parties then shall submit a joint Rule 26(f) report for all six cases, and the court will hold a joint telephonic preliminary pretrial conference for all six cases. The court will defer to the parties' proposed schedules, so long as they take these requirements into account: the court intends to do all six trials sequentially. The court doesn't care in what order the cases are tried; that is for the attorneys to sort out. The court will allow brief gaps (one to three weeks) between the end of one trial and the beginning of the next if that's what the parties want. The court does not try cases the weeks of Independence Day, Christmas or New Year's Day, or the week before Christmas. The court is willing to push out the start of this jury trial six-pack if necessary to make this plan work. The court is fine with consolidating the discovery and motions schedules for all six of these cases if the parties agree, or if the court is persuaded by one side that this is logical and efficient. Toward this end, the court would be pleased if everyone can agree on how to proceed with all six schedules, but that's probably unrealistic, so any disagreements should be noted in the joint report and the court will resolve them at the telephonic conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/2/2020. (arw)
April 2, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
April 2, 2020 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00512. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
March 31, 2020 Case Transferred to the Western District of Wisconsin via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/06/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (Third). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-512-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-139-31832 filed by Kendall Armagost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armagost v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Michael P. North
Represented By: Travis Evan Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Catherine Helm
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Michael P. North
Represented By: Travis Evan Romero-Boeck
Represented By: Catherine Helm
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Catherine A. Faught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Armagost
Represented By: Matthew David Schultz
Represented By: Andrew Edward McGraw
Represented By: Wesley A Bowden
Represented By: Timothy Knurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?