McMillan, Matthew v. Stubhub Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew McMillan
Defendant: Last Minute Transactions Inc. and Stubhub Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00319
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Stubhub Inc.. Stubhub Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Coulson, Nicholas)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Last Minute Transactions Inc.. Last Minute Transactions Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Coulson, Nicholas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Stubhub Inc.. (Campbell, Daniel)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Last Minute Transactions Inc.. (Campbell, Daniel)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Ray Campbell for Defendants Last Minute Transactions Inc., Stubhub Inc.. (Campbell, Daniel)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Last Minute Transactions Inc., Stubhub Inc. (kwf)
April 3, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
April 3, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Last Minute Transactions Inc., Stubhub Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2655633.), filed by Matthew McMillan. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Coulson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan, Matthew v. Stubhub Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last Minute Transactions Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ray Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stubhub Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Ray Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McMillan
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?