Inguran, LLC et al v. ABS Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cytonome/ST, LLC and Inguran, LLC
Defendant: Genus plc and ABS Global, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00349
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 44 Redaction to #40 Brief in Reply by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc (Modl, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 43 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Genus plc served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 6/10/2020: Multiple documents attached. (lak)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #41 Motion to Seal Document #40 Brief in Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/9/2020. (kwf)
June 8, 2020 Filing 41 Motion to Seal Document #40 Brief in Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Modl, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 40 Brief in Reply by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc in Support of #23 Motion to Dismiss (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 39 Redaction to #35 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #36 Motion to Seal Document #23 MOTION TO DISMISS For Failure to State a Claim; granting #24 Motion to Seal Document #35 Brief in Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/29/2020. (kwf)
May 29, 2020 Filing 37 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC re: #24 Motion to Seal Document filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 29, 2020 Filing 36 Motion to Seal Document #35 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 29, 2020 Filing 35 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC re: #23 Motion to Dismiss filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #33 Motion to Admit Kevin Robert Oliver Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/18/2020. (lak)
May 18, 2020 Filing 33 Motion to Admit Kevin Robert Oliver Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2679619.) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Oliver, Kevin)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #27 Motion to Admit Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Motion to Admit Bryan C. Mulder Pro Hac Vice; granting #29 Motion to Admit Steven J. Horowitz Pro Hac Vice; granting #30 Motion to Admit Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice; granting #31 Motion to Admit Jason P. Greenhut Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/18/2020. (lak)
May 18, 2020 Filing 31 Motion to Admit Jason Phillip Greenhut Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2679546.) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Greenhut, Jason)
May 18, 2020 Filing 30 Motion to Admit Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2679542.) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Koh, Stephanie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 Motion to Admit Steven Joseph Horowitz Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2679534.) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Horowitz, Steven)
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 Motion to Admit Bryan Clifford Mulder Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2679528.) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Mulder, Bryan)
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 Motion to Admit Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-26794640758-2.) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Rein, Thomas)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 Brief in Reply by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC in Support of #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 25 Redaction to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS For Failure to State a Claim (Sealed Document) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 Motion to Seal Document #23 MOTION TO DISMISS For Failure to State a Claim (Sealed Document) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS For Failure to State a Claim (Sealed Document) by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Brief in Opposition due 5/29/2020. Brief in Reply due 6/8/2020. (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 22 Brief in Opposition by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc re: #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC (Modl, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of George Andrew Lever Rosbrook filed by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC re: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email between counsel) (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC re: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc (O'Neill, Kirt)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc re: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange Between Counsel) (Modl, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time 30-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Motion to Consolidate by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 5/4/2020. (Modl, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Genus plc. (Modl, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant ABS Global, Inc.. (Modl, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael J. Modl for Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. (Modl, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. ABS Global, Inc. served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Zylstra, Sarah)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendants' response to plaintiff's motion to consolidate cases (dkt. #12 ) is due at the same time as defendants' answer, motion or other response to the complaint and summons. Plaintiffs may file a reply seven days thereafter. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/17/2020. (kwf)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. Response due 4/23/2020. (O'Neill, Kirt)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc. (kwf)
April 16, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
April 16, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. See related cases 14-cv-503-wmc, 17-cv-446-wmc, and 20-cv-85-wmc. (kwf)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion to Admit Kirt Stephen O'Neill Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Admit Daniel L. Moffett Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Admit George Andrew Rosbrook Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Admit Clayton Nicholas Matheson Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Admit Thomas Watson Landers, IV Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/16/2020. (lak)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Thomas Watson Landers, IV Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2662315.) by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (Landers, Thomas)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Clayton Nicholas Matheson Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2662308.) by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (Matheson, Clayton)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Admit George Andrew Rosbrook Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2662305.) by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (Rosbrook, George)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to Admit Daniel L Moffett Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2662301.) by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (Moffett, Daniel)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to Admit Kirt Stephen O'Neill Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2662285.) by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Notice by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC re #1 Complaint, Form AO 120, Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Zylstra, Sarah)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2662197.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 10,583,439, issued 03/10/2020, held by Cytonome/ST, LLC ;, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. US 10,583,439 B2, #2 Summons ABS Global, Inc., #3 Summons Genus plc, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zylstra, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inguran, LLC et al v. ABS Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genus plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cytonome/ST, LLC
Represented By: Clayton Nicholas Matheson
Represented By: Daniel L Moffett
Represented By: Thomas Watson Landers, IV
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: George Andrew Rosbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inguran, LLC
Represented By: Clayton Nicholas Matheson
Represented By: Daniel L Moffett
Represented By: Thomas Watson Landers, IV
Represented By: Sarah Anne Zylstra
Represented By: Kirt Stephen O'Neill
Represented By: George Andrew Rosbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?