Bou-Matic, LLC et al v. Waikato Milking Systems NZ LP et al
Plaintiff: Mofazzal H. Chowdhury and Bou-Matic, LLC
Defendant: Waikato Milking Systems NZ LP and Waikato Milking Systems U.S.A Limited
Case Number: 3:2020cv00350
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Thomas Leone for Plaintiff Mofazzal H. Chowdhury. (Leone, Joseph)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Edward R. Williams, Jr for Plaintiffs Bou-Matic, LLC, Mofazzal H. Chowdhury. (Williams, Edward)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Reagan Liro for Plaintiffs Bou-Matic, LLC, Mofazzal H. Chowdhury. (Liro, Christopher)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Aaron T. Olejniczak for Plaintiffs Bou-Matic, LLC, Mofazzal H. Chowdhury. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf)
April 17, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
April 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Bou-Matic, LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2662761.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 6776120, issued 08/17/2004, held by Mofazzal H. Chowdhury ;, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US6776120, #2 Exhibit B Boumatic Turbo Magnum Brochure, #3 Exhibit C Waikato Milking Systems Brochure, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Olejniczak, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bou-Matic, LLC et al v. Waikato Milking Systems NZ LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waikato Milking Systems NZ LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waikato Milking Systems U.S.A Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mofazzal H. Chowdhury
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bou-Matic, LLC
Represented By: Aaron T. Olejniczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?